Muldoon v. Sensitive Care Cosmetic & Family Dentistry, LLC et al
Connecticut District Court | |
Judge: | Omar A Williams |
Case #: | 3:25-cv-00347 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Mar 10, 2025 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 4:44 AM EDT |
Defendant
Alexander Quintner
|
|
Defendant
Sensitive Care Cosmetic & Family Dentistry, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Catherine Muldoon
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Monday, April 07, 2025 | ||
14 | 14
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Sensitive Care Cosmetic & Family Dentistry, LLC waiver sent on 4/1/2025, answer due 6/2/2025 filed by Catherine Muldoon. (Varraso, Michael) |
|
13 | 13
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Alexander Quintner waiver sent on 4/1/2025, answer due 6/2/2025 filed by Catherine Muldoon. (Varraso, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, April 01, 2025 | ||
12 | 12
![]() ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Alexander Quintner, Sensitive Care Cosmetic & Family Dentistry, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael Varraso* *Law Offices of Wyatt & Associates* *17 Elm Street, Suite C 211* *Keene, NH 03431*. (Kelsey, N) |
|
Monday, March 31, 2025 | ||
service
Request to Issue Summons
Mon 03/31 3:56 PM
Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Alexander Quintner, Sensitive Care Cosmetic & Family Dentistry, LLC. (Varraso, Michael) |
||
Friday, March 21, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
![]() ORDER re: Initial Discovery Protocols. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 3/21/2025.(Bozek, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, March 12, 2025 | ||
10 | 10
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Jacob Wyatt on behalf of Catherine Muldoon (Wyatt, Benjamin) |
|
Tuesday, March 11, 2025 | ||
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of8 Standing Order re: Letters,7 Notice re: Initial Discovery Protocols, 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement,6 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction,5 Standing Protective Order,3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines,4 Electronic Filing Order,1 Complaint, filed by Catherine Muldoon Signed by Clerk on 03/11/2025.(Kelsey, N) |
|
Monday, March 10, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Standing Order re: Letters. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 03/10/2025.(Kelsey, N) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Notice re: Initial Discovery Protocols. Signed by Clerk on 03/10/2025.(Kelsey, N) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
6 | 6
![]() Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Kelsey, N) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 03/10/2025.(Kelsey, N) |
|
4 | 4
![]() ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 03/10/2025.(Kelsey, N) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/9/2025; Discovery due by 9/9/2025; Dispositive Motions due by 10/14/2025 Signed by Clerk on 03/10/2025. (Kelsey, N) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice re: Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/11 8:17 AM
Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 3/10/2025.(Maturo, F.) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT Catherine Muldoon against Alexander Quintner, Sensitive Care Cosmetic & Family Dentistry, LLC ( Filing fee $405 receipt number BCTDC-8092424.), filed by Catherine Muldoon.(Varraso, Michael) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
utility
NEW Case Assignment
Tue 03/11 11:42 AM
CASE ASSIGNMENT: District Judge Omar A. Williams assigned to the case. If the District Judge issues an Order of Referral to a Magistrate Judge for any matter other than settlement, the matter will be referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas O. Farrish. (Freberg, B) |