Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Aileen M Cannon
Case #: 9:25-cv-80334
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:0078 Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2025
Terminated:Mar 17, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 6:51 AM EDT
Defendant
Brian W. Bolster
Defendant
Terrell Kirk Crews, II
Defendant
John W. Ketchum
Defendant
Rebecca J. Kujawa
Defendant
James L. Robo
Defendant
XPLR Infrastructure, LP
Plaintiff
Steven Paul Jarvis
Represented By
Jayne Arnold Goldstein
Shepherd Finkelman Miller & Shah LLP
contact info
James M. LoPiano
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
Nathan C. Zipperian
Miller Shah LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, March 17, 2025
9 9 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Mon 03/17 11:00 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 3/17/2025. See attached document for full details. (caw)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty Fri 03/14 1:45 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Steven Paul Jarvis (Goldstein, Jayne)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
7 7 2 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 03/13 2:52 PM
ORDER DISMISSING SHOTGUN COMPLAINT AND PERMITTING REPLEADING. Amended Complaint due by 3/26/2025. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 3/13/2025. See attached document for full details. (caw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
6 6 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Wed 03/12 1:20 PM
ORDER REQUIRING COMBINED RESPONSES. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 3/12/2025. See attached document for full details. (caw)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Bar Letter Wed 03/12 9:42 AM
Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney James M. LoPiano, mailing date March 12, 2025, (pt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
4 4 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Tue 03/11 6:48 PM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES ON SEALING/REDACTION: Notwithstanding the requirements of Local Rule 5.4 and/or any protective order, the parties are prohibited from filing anything under seal or from redacting any content from a court filing or exhibit/attachment (except for the personal data identifiers listed in Section 6A of this District's CM/ECF Administrative Procedures) unless the party with a stated interest in sealing/redaction first seeks and obtains permission from the Court via a motion for leave. The motion for leave must be filed after meaningful conferral with the opposing party (or parties) and be filed publicly except as authorized by prior Court order. Additionally, the motion for leave shall specify the particularized basis for sealing the proposed material; shall describe the information/documents to be sealed with as much specificity as possible but without attaching the proposed sealed material; shall indicate the proposed duration of the seal request and the reasons why means other than sealing are unavailable or unsatisfactory; shall contain a separate certificate of conference section indicating the results of the parties' meaningful conferral; and shall be filed at last three business days before any related deadline to permit adequate Court consideration. The party seeking authorization to seal material shall not file or otherwise attach the subject material until the Court has ruled on the motion for leave. Finally, all parties are advised that mere designation of material as confidential and/or otherwise subject to a protective order does not bind the Court, does not supplant the requirements of the Local Rules on sealing, and does not otherwise relieve the party seeking sealing/redaction from justifying its request under applicable legal principals governing the presumption of public access to civil proceedings. Failure to comply with this Notice may result in immediate unsealing of any unauthorized shielded material. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 3/11/2025. (jco)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 03/11 12:10 PM
Summons Issued as to Brian W. Bolster, Terrell Kirk Crews, II, John W. Ketchum, Rebecca J. Kujawa, James L. Robo, and XPLR Infrastructure, LP. (caw)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Tue 03/11 11:58 AM
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (caw)
Related: [-]
1 1 39 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 03/10 5:51 PM
COMPLAINT against Brian W. Bolster, Terrell Kirk Crews, II, John W. Ketchum, Rebecca J. Kujawa, James L. Robo, XPLR Infrastructure, LP. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18270413, filed by Steven Paul Jarvis.(Goldstein, Jayne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s) XPLR Infrastructure, LP f/k/a NextEra Energy Partners, LP,
Att: 3 Summon(s) John W. Ketchum,
Att: 4 Summon(s) James L. Robo,
Att: 5 Summon(s) Brian W. Bolster,
Att: 6 Summon(s) Terrell Kirk Crews II,
Att: 7 Summon(s) Rebecca J. Kujawa