California Central District Court
Judge:Andre Birotte Jr
Referred: Stephanie S Christensen
Case #: 2:25-cv-02118
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 2:13 AM PDT
Defendant
Comenity Capital Bank
Represented By
Nathan Andrew Searles
Womble Bond Dickinson Us LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeremy Lewi
Represented By
Nicholas J Enns
Loker Law, Apc
contact info
Matthew Michael Loker
Loker Law, Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, May 16, 2025
15 15 notice Clerical Error (G-11) Fri 05/16 12:32 PM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR:Text Only Entry. Due to a clerical error, the case was assigned to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. The case is returned for random reassignment to Magistrate Judge Stephanie S. Christensen for all further proceedings. The case will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:25-cv-02118-AB-SSCx.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (nhac)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
14 14 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Thu 05/08 8:33 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 6/6/2025 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (dta)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 05/02 7:13 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Comenity Capital Bank.(Searles, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
12 12 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 04/02 11:58 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Comenity Capital Bank, identifying Bread Financial Holdings, Inc. and Bread Financial Payments, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Searles, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
11 11 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Tue 04/01 8:38 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Comenity Capital Bank answer now due 5/2/2025, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by defendant Comenity Capital Bank.(Attorney Nathan Andrew Searles added to party Comenity Capital Bank(pty:dft))(Searles, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
10 10 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 03/20 2:21 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jeremy Lewi, upon Defendant Comenity Capital Bank served on 3/12/2025, answer due 4/2/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Dani Snow, Authorized Person in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Loker, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 03/14 11:05 AM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (dta)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 03/11 12:47 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Comenity Capital Bank. (sh)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 03/11 12:40 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 03/11 12:39 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 03/11 12:39 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (sh)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
4 4 notice Summons Request Mon 03/10 3:56 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Jeremy Lewi. (Loker, Matthew)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 03/10 3:55 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jeremy Lewi, (Loker, Matthew)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 03/10 3:54 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jeremy Lewi. (Loker, Matthew)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 03/10 3:52 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39266981 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Jeremy Lewi. (Attorney Matthew Michael Loker added to party Jeremy Lewi(pty:pla))(Loker, Matthew)
Related: [-]