Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Mary S Scriven
Referred: Thomas G Wilson
Case #: 8:25-cv-00576
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 6:08 AM EDT
Defendant
5x5 Technologies, Inc.
Represented By
Brent A. Hawkins
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Dean Adrian Kent
Trenam, Kemker, Scharf, Barkin, Frye, O'Neill & Mullis,
contact info
Karon N. Fowler
Morgan Lewis & Bockius
contact info
Sarah Guske
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Pointivo, Inc.
Represented By
Carey Matthew Rozier
Rozier Hardt Mcdonough PLLC
contact info
Kenneth A. Matuszewski
Rozier Hardt Mcdonough PLLC
contact info
Brian R. Gilchrist
Allen, Dyer, Doppelt, & Gilchrist, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
27 27 motion Dismiss Wed 04/30 7:04 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by 5x5 Technologies, Inc..(Hawkins, Brent)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Appendix A,
Att: 9 Appendix B,
Att: 10 Appendix C,
Att: 11 Appendix D
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
26 26 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 04/22 10:07 AM
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING 10 Unopposed Motion to Enlarge Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant shall file an answer or other response to the Complaint on or before April 30, 2025. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/22/2025. (KMA)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
25 25 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 04/18 9:45 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Brent A. Hawkins Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission - Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ELA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
24 24 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 04/17 4:41 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Karon N. Fowler and Sarah J. Guske Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission - Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (FLY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/17 8:34 AM
ORDER granting 21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Accordingly, Brent A. Hawkins is authorized to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 4/16/2025. (KMN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/16 11:04 AM
ORDER granting 19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Accordingly, Karon N. Fowler and Sarah J. Guske are authorized to appear in this matter pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 4/15/2025. (KMN)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/15 10:59 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Brent A. Hawkins to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-23246873 for $150 by 5x5 Technologies, Inc.. (Kent, Dean)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/15 10:57 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Sarah J. Guske to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-23246819 for $150 by 5x5 Technologies, Inc.. (Kent, Dean)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/15 10:54 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Karon N. Fowler to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-23246774 for $150 by 5x5 Technologies, Inc.. (Kent, Dean)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
18 18 service Summons returned executed Wed 04/09 4:40 PM
RETURN of service executed on 03/13/2025 by Pointivo, Inc. as to 5x5 Technologies, Inc.. (Rozier, Carey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
17 17 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 04/08 2:36 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL C. Matthew Rozier Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission - Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ELA)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/08 8:31 AM
ORDER granting 13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Accordingly, Matthew Rozier is authorized to appear in this case pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 4/7/2025. (KMN)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Mon 04/07 3:55 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Brian R. Gilchrist on behalf of Pointivo, Inc.. Lead Counsel: C. Matthew Rozier, Esq.. (Gilchrist, Brian)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 04/07 12:33 PM
Second NOTICE TO COUNSEL C. Matthew Rozier, Kenneth A. Matuszewski, and Brian R. Gilchrist of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MLB)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 05, 2025
13 13 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Sat 04/05 12:21 AM
MOTION for C. Matthew Rozier, Esq. to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-23211327 for $150 by Pointivo, Inc.. (Gilchrist, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
12 12 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Wed 04/02 2:08 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by 5x5 Technologies, Inc.. (Kent, Dean)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of a Related Action Wed 04/02 2:05 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by 5x5 Technologies, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Kent, Dean)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Wed 04/02 2:04 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by 5x5 Technologies, Inc.. (Kent, Dean)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Wed 04/02 2:01 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Dean Adrian Kent on behalf of 5x5 Technologies, Inc.. Lead Counsel: Dean A. Kent. (Kent, Dean)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 03/12 10:48 AM
NOTICE to Counsel of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BCH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
7 7 order Standing Order Wed 03/12 8:38 AM
STANDING ORDER regarding Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 3/11/2025. (KMN)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 03/11 4:43 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL C. Matthew Rozier and Kenneth A. Matuszewski Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the lawyer seeking Special Admission or the motion may be filed in paper format; Pay the Special Admission Fee; (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MSN)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 03/11 4:42 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL C. Matthew Rozier, Kenneth A. Matuszewski, and Brian R. Gilchrist of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MSN)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Patent/Trademark Report Tue 03/11 4:41 PM
Patent Report electronically sent to the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (MSN)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons issued Tue 03/11 4:33 PM
SUMMONS issued as to 5x5 Technologies, Inc. (MSN)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 03/11 8:37 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:25-cv-576-MSS-TGW. (ARL)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
1 1 37 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 03/10 6:04 PM
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against 5x5 TECHNOLOGIES, INC. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-23111744) filed by POINTIVO, INC..(Gilchrist, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Proposed Summons,
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet