Florida Middle District Court
Judge:William F Jung
Referred: Thomas G Wilson
Case #: 8:25-cv-00577
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
CauseAmericans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 6:08 AM EDT
Defendant
D&D Accounting Services LLC
Represented By
Jose Ignacio Leon
Gordon & Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Westbrook
Represented By
Marie A. Mattox
Marie A Mattox PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, March 20, 2025
13 13 notice Notice of a Related Action Thu 03/20 10:23 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Elizabeth Westbrook. Related case(s): No (Mattox, Marie)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Thu 03/20 10:13 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Elizabeth Westbrook. (Mattox, Marie)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Thu 03/20 10:11 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Marie A. Mattox on behalf of Elizabeth Westbrook. Lead Counsel: Marie A. Mattox. (Mattox, Marie)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/17 6:43 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by D&D Accounting Services LLC.(Leon, Jose)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of a Related Action Fri 03/14 9:36 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by D&D Accounting Services LLC. Related case(s): No (Leon, Jose)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Fri 03/14 9:35 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Jose Ignacio Leon on behalf of D&D Accounting Services LLC. Lead Counsel: Jose I. Leon, Esq.. (Leon, Jose)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 03/12 4:16 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Marie A. Mattox and Jose Ignacio Leon of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MSN)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Wed 03/12 11:41 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by D&D Accounting Services LLC. (Leon, Jose)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 03/12 8:54 AM
NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge . (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JCG)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 03/12 8:53 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to file promptly a Notice of a Related Action identifying and describing any related action either pending or closed in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement. Counsel must make their disclosures using the standard court form. The Disclosure Statement form can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JCG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
3 3 order Standing Order Wed 03/12 8:39 AM
STANDING ORDER regarding Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 3/11/2025. (KMN)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 03/11 9:45 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:25-cv-00577-WFJ-TGW. (JOS)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 03/10 6:29 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sixth Judicial Circuit in Pinellas County, FL, case number 24-005634-CI filed in State Court on 12/23/2024. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-23111771 filed by D&D Accounting Services LLC.(Leon, Jose)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court COMPLAINT,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 State Court Docket Sheet,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet Federal,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet State