Surface Warehouse, LP v. Architectural Surfaces Group, LLC
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Alan D Albright |
Referred: | Susan Hightower |
Case #: | 1:25-cv-00359 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 10, 2025 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 5:40 AM CDT |
Counter Defendant
Surface Warehouse, LP
|
Represented By
|
Counter Plaintiff
Architectural Surfaces Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Architectural Surfaces Group, LLC
303 Colorado Street Suite 2400
Austin, TX 78701 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Surface Warehouse, LP
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 36 minutes ago |
Friday, May 16, 2025 | ||
21 | 21
![]() Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order by Surface Warehouse, LP. (Krumholz, Richard) |
|
20 | 20
![]() Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by Surface Warehouse, LP. (Krumholz, Richard) |
|
Monday, April 28, 2025 | ||
19 | 19
![]() DOCKET CONTROL ORDER PURSUANT TO RULES 16(b) AND 26(f) due on or before 5/16/2025. Signed by Judge Susan Hightower. (cc3) |
|
Thursday, April 24, 2025 | ||
18 | 18
![]() ORDER GRANTING17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to FELICIA J. BOYD. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (cc3) |
|
Wednesday, April 23, 2025 | ||
17 | 17
![]() MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard Samson Krumholz for Felicia J. Boyd ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-20085183) by on behalf of Surface Warehouse, LP.. Motions referred to Judge Susan Hightower. (Krumholz, Richard) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, April 07, 2025 | ||
16 | 16
![]() ANSWER to Complaint by Surface Warehouse, LP.(Piorkowski, Joseph) |
|
15 | 15
![]() RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Surface Warehouse, LP identifying Other Affiliate Surface Enterprises, LLC for Surface Warehouse, LP, Surface Warehouse, LP. (Piorkowski, Joseph) |
|
Monday, March 31, 2025 | ||
14 | 14
![]() ORDER GRANTING11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to MICHAEL D. MOON, JR. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge Susan Hightower. (cc3) |
|
13 | 13
![]() ORDER GRANTING10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to JOSEPH G. EATON. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge Susan Hightower. (cc3) |
|
12 | 12
![]() ORDER GRANTING9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to MADISON WALKER. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge Susan Hightower. (cc3) |
|
Monday, March 24, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
![]() MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Timothy E. Hudson on behalf of Michael D. Moon, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-19952522) by on behalf of Architectural Surfaces Group, LLC.. Motions referred to Judge Susan Hightower. (Hudson, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
10 | 10
![]() MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Timothy E. Hudson on behalf of Joseph G. Eaton ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-19952381) by on behalf of Architectural Surfaces Group, LLC.. Motions referred to Judge Susan Hightower. (Hudson, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
9 | 9
![]() MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard Samson Krumholz For Madison Walker ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-19950532) by on behalf of Surface Warehouse, LP.. Motions referred to Judge Susan Hightower. (Krumholz, Richard) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, March 18, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Defendant Architectural Surfaces Group, LLC's Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Petition and Verified Application for Temporary and Permanent Injunctions and Counterclaim , COUNTERCLAIM against Surface Warehouse, LP by Architectural Surfaces Group, LLC.(Gasink, John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, March 11, 2025 | ||
7 | 7
![]() SUPPLEMENT to1 Notice of Removal,, Supplement to Civil Cover Sheet by Architectural Surfaces Group, LLC. (Gasink, John) |
|
6 | 6
![]() ORDER that the removing party, if it has not already done so, shall within ten (10) days from the date of this order supplement the record with state court pleadings. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (kp) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Order Directing Madison Walker to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (kp) |
|
4 | 4
![]() DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 1 Notice of Removal: The Notice of Removal you filed is deficient because the Supplement to the Civil Cover Sheet is not attached. This form can be located on our website. Please prepare and electronically submit the supplement using Civil Events - Other Filings - Other Documents - Supplement. This form is required for any Notice of Removal filed in the Western District of Texas. (kp) |
|
Monday, March 10, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
![]() STANDING ORDER (dated 02 27-2025 REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Susan Hightower. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (kp) |
|
2 | 2
![]() RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Architectural Surfaces Group, LLC. (Gasink, John) |
|
1 | 1
![]() NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Architectural Surfaces Group, LLC (Filing fee $405 receipt number ATXWDC-19894981), filed by Architectural Surfaces Group, LLC.(Gasink, John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 03/11 10:28 AM
Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kp) |
||
misc
To be Referred to AU Mag Judge
Tue 03/11 10:28 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Hightower. (kp) |
||
misc
Jury Demand
Tue 03/11 10:28 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Architectural Surfaces Group, LLC, Surface Warehouse, LP. (kp) |