Texas Western District Court
Judge:Alan D Albright
Referred: Susan Hightower
Case #: 1:25-cv-00359
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 5:40 AM CDT
Counter Defendant
Surface Warehouse, LP
Represented By
Joseph D. Piorkowski
Norton Rose Fulbright Us LLP
contact info
Richard Samson Krumholz
Norton Rose Fulbright Us LLP
contact info
Madison Johnson
Norton Rose Fulbright Us LLP
contact info
Felicia J. Boyd
Norton Rose Fulbright Us LLP
contact info
Counter Plaintiff
Architectural Surfaces Group, LLC
Represented By
John Winslow Gasink
Scott Douglas & Mcconnico LLP
contact info
Timothy E. Hudson
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Stephen E. McConnico
Scott, Douglass & Mcconnico, LLP
contact info
Jenna Gillett Johnson
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Michael D. Moon, Jr.
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Joseph G. Eaton
Barnes þburg, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Architectural Surfaces Group, LLC
303 Colorado Street Suite 2400
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
John Winslow Gasink
Scott Douglas & Mcconnico LLP
contact info
Timothy E. Hudson
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Stephen E. McConnico
Scott, Douglass & Mcconnico, LLP
contact info
Jenna Gillett Johnson
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Michael D. Moon, Jr.
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Joseph G. Eaton
Barnes þburg, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Surface Warehouse, LP
Represented By
Joseph D. Piorkowski
Norton Rose Fulbright Us LLP
contact info
Richard Samson Krumholz
Norton Rose Fulbright Us LLP
contact info
Madison Johnson
Norton Rose Fulbright Us LLP
contact info
Felicia J. Boyd
Norton Rose Fulbright Us LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 31 minutes ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
21 21 misc Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Fri 05/16 3:47 PM
Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order by Surface Warehouse, LP. (Krumholz, Richard)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Fri 05/16 3:44 PM
Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by Surface Warehouse, LP. (Krumholz, Richard)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
19 19 8 pgs order Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Sched Order Mon 04/28 2:34 PM
DOCKET CONTROL ORDER PURSUANT TO RULES 16(b) AND 26(f) due on or before 5/16/2025. Signed by Judge Susan Hightower. (cc3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/24 11:41 AM
ORDER GRANTING17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to FELICIA J. BOYD. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (cc3)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
17 17 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/23 3:44 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard Samson Krumholz for Felicia J. Boyd ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-20085183) by on behalf of Surface Warehouse, LP.. Motions referred to Judge Susan Hightower. (Krumholz, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, April 07, 2025
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/07 6:20 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Surface Warehouse, LP.(Piorkowski, Joseph)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Mon 04/07 6:14 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Surface Warehouse, LP identifying Other Affiliate Surface Enterprises, LLC for Surface Warehouse, LP, Surface Warehouse, LP. (Piorkowski, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/01 8:43 AM
ORDER GRANTING11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to MICHAEL D. MOON, JR. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge Susan Hightower. (cc3)
Related: [-]
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/01 8:41 AM
ORDER GRANTING10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to JOSEPH G. EATON. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge Susan Hightower. (cc3)
Related: [-]
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/01 8:40 AM
ORDER GRANTING9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to MADISON WALKER. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge Susan Hightower. (cc3)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/24 4:48 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Timothy E. Hudson on behalf of Michael D. Moon, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-19952522) by on behalf of Architectural Surfaces Group, LLC.. Motions referred to Judge Susan Hightower. (Hudson, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
10 10 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/24 4:44 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Timothy E. Hudson on behalf of Joseph G. Eaton ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-19952381) by on behalf of Architectural Surfaces Group, LLC.. Motions referred to Judge Susan Hightower. (Hudson, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
9 9 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/24 1:51 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard Samson Krumholz For Madison Walker ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-19950532) by on behalf of Surface Warehouse, LP.. Motions referred to Judge Susan Hightower. (Krumholz, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Tue 03/18 8:59 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Defendant Architectural Surfaces Group, LLC's Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Petition and Verified Application for Temporary and Permanent Injunctions and Counterclaim , COUNTERCLAIM against Surface Warehouse, LP by Architectural Surfaces Group, LLC.(Gasink, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
7 7 misc Supplement to Tue 03/11 10:40 AM
SUPPLEMENT to1 Notice of Removal,, Supplement to Civil Cover Sheet by Architectural Surfaces Group, LLC. (Gasink, John)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs order Order Tue 03/11 10:33 AM
ORDER that the removing party, if it has not already done so, shall within ten (10) days from the date of this order supplement the record with state court pleadings. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (kp)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order to File Pro Hac Motion Tue 03/11 10:32 AM
Order Directing Madison Walker to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (kp)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Deficiency Notice Tue 03/11 10:32 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 1 Notice of Removal: The Notice of Removal you filed is deficient because the Supplement to the Civil Cover Sheet is not attached. This form can be located on our website. Please prepare and electronically submit the supplement using Civil Events - Other Filings - Other Documents - Supplement. This form is required for any Notice of Removal filed in the Western District of Texas. (kp)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
3 3 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 03/11 10:29 AM
STANDING ORDER (dated 02 27-2025 REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Susan Hightower. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (kp)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Mon 03/10 7:12 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Architectural Surfaces Group, LLC. (Gasink, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 03/10 6:43 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Architectural Surfaces Group, LLC (Filing fee $405 receipt number ATXWDC-19894981), filed by Architectural Surfaces Group, LLC.(Gasink, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Citation Petition,
Att: 2 43 pgs Exhibit Plaintiff's First Amended Petition and Verified Application for Temporary and Permanent Injunctions.pdf,
Att: 3 Exhibit Proposed Ord granting P's Application for TI,
Att: 4 Exhibit Mtn for Expedited Discovery,
Att: 5 Exhibit Proposed Ord granting Mtn for Exped Discovery,
Att: 6 Exhibit Docket Sheet,
Att: 7 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 8 Exhibit Karanam Declaration
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 03/11 10:28 AM
Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kp)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to AU Mag Judge Tue 03/11 10:28 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Hightower. (kp)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Tue 03/11 10:28 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Architectural Surfaces Group, LLC, Surface Warehouse, LP. (kp)
Related: [-]