Texas Western District Court
Judge:David A Ezra
Case #: 1:25-cv-00361
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 5:41 AM CDT
Defendant
Pinnacle Property Management Services, LLC
Plaintiff
Jose Villanueva
Represented By
Bernard R. Mazaheri
Mazaheri & Mazaheri
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 03/11 1:19 PM
Summons Issued as to Pinnacle Property Management Services, LLC. (kp)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 03/10 8:35 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jose Villanueva. (Mazaheri, Bernard)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/10 8:34 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-19895068), filed by Jose Villanueva.(Mazaheri, Bernard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 03/11 1:17 PM
Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kp)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to AU Mag Judge Tue 03/11 1:18 PM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin Howell. (kp)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Tue 03/11 1:18 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jose Villanueva. (kp)
Related: [-]