Colorado District Court
Judge:Kathryn A Starnella
Case #: 1:25-cv-00769
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 3:22 AM MDT
Defendant
City of Monte Vista, Colorado
Represented By
Nicholas Christaan Poppe
Nathan Dumm & Mayer PC
contact info
Timothy Walsh
Nathan Dumm & Mayer P.C.
contact info
Ashley M. Hernandez-Schlagel
Nathan Dumm & Mayer PC
contact info
Defendant
Stephen Hunzeker
Represented By
Eden R. Rolland
Fowler Schimberg Flanagan & Mcletchie PC
contact info
Rachel Lisotta Bradley
Fowler Schimberg Flanagan & Mcletchie PC
contact info
Andrew R. McLetchie
Fowler Schimberg Flanagan & Mcletchie PC
contact info
Defendant
Michael Martinez
Represented By
Nicholas Christaan Poppe
Nathan Dumm & Mayer PC
contact info
Timothy Walsh
Nathan Dumm & Mayer P.C.
contact info
Ashley M. Hernandez-Schlagel
Nathan Dumm & Mayer PC
contact info
Defendant
John Rosecrans
Represented By
Nicholas Christaan Poppe
Nathan Dumm & Mayer PC
contact info
Timothy Walsh
Nathan Dumm & Mayer P.C.
contact info
Ashley M. Hernandez-Schlagel
Nathan Dumm & Mayer PC
contact info
Defendant
Robert Willett
Plaintiff
Jimmy Lee Garcia
Represented By
Mari Anne Newman
Newman Mcnulty, LLC
contact info
Madeline Marie Leibin
Newman Mcnulty, LLC
contact info
Andrew Joseph McNulty
Newman Mcnulty
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
20 20 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Thu 04/24 9:47 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew R. McLetchie on behalf of Stephen HunzekerAttorney Andrew R. McLetchie added to party Stephen Hunzeker(pty:dft) (McLetchie, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
17 17 3 pgs order Order Fri 04/11 8:29 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 10 April 2025. Scheduling Conference set for 7/10/2025 09:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Continuation of Main Document,
Att: 2 Continuation of Main Document
16 16 order Minute Order Thu 04/10 4:16 PM
MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#3] is June 26, 2025. by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 4/10/2025. Text Only Entry (kaslc2, )
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Thu 04/10 3:31 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Eden R. Rolland on behalf of Stephen HunzekerAttorney Eden R. Rolland added to party Stephen Hunzeker(pty:dft) (Rolland, Eden)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Thu 04/10 3:07 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Rachel Lisotta Bradley on behalf of Stephen HunzekerAttorney Rachel Lisotta Bradley added to party Stephen Hunzeker(pty:dft) (Bradley, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
13 13 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Wed 04/02 2:33 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Timothy Walsh on behalf of City of Monte Vista, Colorado, John Rosecrans, Michael MartinezAttorney Timothy Walsh added to party City of Monte Vista, Colorado(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy Walsh added to party John Rosecrans(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy Walsh added to party Michael Martinez(pty:dft) (Walsh, Timothy)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Wed 04/02 2:32 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Nicholas Christaan Poppe on behalf of City of Monte Vista, Colorado, John Rosecrans, Michael MartinezAttorney Nicholas Christaan Poppe added to party City of Monte Vista, Colorado(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas Christaan Poppe added to party John Rosecrans(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas Christaan Poppe added to party Michael Martinez(pty:dft) (Poppe, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Wed 04/02 2:32 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ashley M. Hernandez-Schlagel on behalf of City of Monte Vista, Colorado, John Rosecrans, Michael MartinezAttorney Ashley M. Hernandez-Schlagel added to party City of Monte Vista, Colorado(pty:dft), Attorney Ashley M. Hernandez-Schlagel added to party John Rosecrans(pty:dft), Attorney Ashley M. Hernandez-Schlagel added to party Michael Martinez(pty:dft) (Hernandez-Schlagel, Ashley)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Waiver of Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Wed 04/02 12:54 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jimmy Lee Garcia. John Rosecrans waiver sent on 3/31/2025, answer due 5/30/2025. (McNulty, Andrew)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Waiver of Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Wed 04/02 12:53 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jimmy Lee Garcia. Michael Martinez waiver sent on 3/31/2025, answer due 5/30/2025. (McNulty, Andrew)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Waiver of Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Wed 04/02 12:52 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jimmy Lee Garcia. City of Monte Vista, Colorado waiver sent on 3/31/2025, answer due 5/30/2025. (McNulty, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
7 7 service Waiver of Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Mon 03/31 11:39 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jimmy Lee Garcia. Stephen Hunzeker waiver sent on 3/26/2025, answer due 5/27/2025. (McNulty, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 03/17 4:25 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT *CORRECTED* Complaint against City of Monte Vista, Colorado, Stephen Hunzeker, Michael Martinez, John Rosecrans, Robert Willett, filed by James Garcia.(Newman, Mari)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Tue 03/11 10:20 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew Joseph McNulty on behalf of James GarciaAttorney Andrew Joseph McNulty added to party James Garcia(pty:pla) (McNulty, Andrew)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Tue 03/11 9:59 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Madeline Marie Leibin on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Madeline Marie Leibin added to party James Garcia(pty:pla) (Leibin, Madeline)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Tue 03/11 8:30 AM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (agryan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Case Assigned to Judge Tue 03/11 8:29 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. Text Only Entry. (agryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/10 11:48 PM
COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against City of Monte Vista, Colorado, Stephen Hunzeker, Michael Martinez, John Rosecrans, Robert Willett (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-10204343)Attorney Mari Anne Newman added to party James Garcia(pty:pla), filed by James Garcia.(Newman, Mari)
Related: [-]