West Virginia Southern District Court
Judge:David A Faber
Case #: 1:25-cv-00153
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 5:09 AM EDT
Defendant
Senior Trooper J. I. Jones
Plaintiff
Darius Lester
Represented By
John H. Bryan
John H. Bryan, Attorneys At Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
2 2 order Mag. Judge Aboulhosn - Standing Order For Assignment And Referral of Civil Actions And Matters Tue 03/11 10:30 AM
STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED SEPTEMBER 1, 2024. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn. (cc: counsel of record; any pro se party) (arb)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/11 10:22 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand. Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8841306. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (arb)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned Wed 03/12 8:54 AM
CASE assigned to Senior Judge David A. Faber. (klc)
Related: [-]