Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Brandon S Long
Referred: Karen Wells Roby
Case #: 2:25-cv-00469
Nature of Suit340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine
Cause43:1333 Outer Continental Shelf Lands Act
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 6:06 AM CDT
Defendant
Sanare Energy Partners, LLC
Represented By
Courtney Crowell
Pusateri, Johnston, Guillot & Greenbaum
contact info
Robert R Johnston
Pusateri, Johnston, Guillot & Greenbaum, LLC
contact info
Ross Adam Ledet
Pusateri Johnston Guillot & Greenbaum
contact info
Constance C Waguespack
Pusateri, Johnston, Guillot & Greenbaum, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By
Jake P. Skaggs
Cozen & O'Connor (houston)
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, April 07, 2025
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/07 4:22 PM
ANSWER to4 Complaint by Sanare Energy Partners, LLC.Attorney Robert R Johnston added to party Sanare Energy Partners, LLC(pty:dft).(Johnston, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 03/20 11:41 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; Sanare Energy Partners, LLC served on 3/17/2025, answer due 4/7/2025. (Skaggs, Jake)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs order Order Transferring Case Thu 03/20 10:39 AM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Brandon S. Long and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown, Magistrate Judge Michael North no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on March 19, 2025.(mp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
6 6 service Summons Issued Wed 03/12 9:43 AM
Summons Issued as to Sanare Energy Partners, LLC. (gla)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
5 5 misc Initial Case Assignment Tue 03/11 1:20 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cmi)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Complaint Tue 03/11 1:15 PM
COMPLAINT against Sanare Energy Partners, LLC (Fee previously paid) filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Skaggs, Jake)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Statement of Corporate Disclosure Tue 03/11 12:29 PM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Skaggs, Jake)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Related Case(s) Tue 03/11 12:27 PM
Notice of Related Case(s) by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company of related case(s) 2:24-cv-1627 and 2:24-cv-2214. (Skaggs, Jake)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/11 12:25 PM
COMPLAINT against Sanare Energy Partners, LLC (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10915425) filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.Attorney Jake P. Skaggs added to party State Farm Fire and Casualty Company(pty:pla).(Skaggs, Jake)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons