Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-17472

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Rosemary Gambardella
Case #: 2:25-ap-01107
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
U.S. BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS OWNER TRUSTEE FOR RCF 2 ACQUISITION TRUST
Represented By
U.S. BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS OWNER TRUSTEE FOR RCF 2 ACQUISITION TRUST
contact info
Defendant
Community Dream Living, Inc.
67 Elmora Avenue
Elizabeth, NJ 07202
Represented By
Community Dream Living, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Alva M Muhammad, Plaintiff
248 Ogden Street
Orange, NJ 07050
Represented By
Linwood A. Jones
Linwood A. Jones
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
court Order Authorizing Case Reassignment from RG to MEH Tue 05/06 12:12 PM
Text Order Authorizing Case Reassignment effective May 5, 2025: Judge Rosemary Gambardella removed from the case. Judge Mark E. Hall added to the case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Christine M. Gravelle on 5/5/2025. (mhh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 04/16 8:17 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Kenneth Borger Jr on behalf of U.S. BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS OWNER TRUSTEE FOR RCF 2 ACQUISITION TRUST. (Borger, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
4 4 court Document Fri 03/14 1:09 PM
Document re: Summons Attachment Related [+] (Browne, Christopher)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued to Alva M Muhammad for Service on Community Dream Living, Inc. Answer due on 4/14/2025; U.S. BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS OWNER TRUSTEE FOR RCF 2 ACQUISITION TRUST Answer due on 4/14/2025 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 6/17/2025 at 02:00 PM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Attachment)
Thursday, March 13, 2025
3 3 court Summons Issued Thu 03/13 1:22 PM
Summons Issued to Alva M Muhammad for Service on Community Dream Living, Inc. Answer due on 4/14/2025; U.S. BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS OWNER TRUSTEE FOR RCF 2 ACQUISITION TRUST Answer due on 4/14/2025 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 6/17/2025 at 02:00 PM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (Browne, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Attachment
court Hearing Withdrawn (Document) Thu 03/13 1:06 PM
Hearing Withdrawn Related [+] (Browne, Christopher)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued to Alva M Muhammad for Service on Community Dream Living, Inc. Answer due on 4/10/2025; U.S. BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS OWNER TRUSTEE FOR RCF 2 ACQUISITION TRUST Answer due on 4/10/2025 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 6/17/2025 at 02:00 PM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Attachment)
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
2 2 court Summons Issued Tue 03/11 1:53 PM
Summons Issued to Alva M Muhammad for Service on Community Dream Living, Inc. Answer due on 4/10/2025; U.S. BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS OWNER TRUSTEE FOR RCF 2 ACQUISITION TRUST Answer due on 4/10/2025 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 6/17/2025 at 02:00 PM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (Browne, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Attachment
Monday, March 10, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/10 11:45 PM
Adversary case 25-01107 Complaint by Alva M Muhammad, U.S. BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS OWNER TRUSTEE FOR RCF 2 ACQUISITION TRUST against U.S. BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS OWNER TRUSTEE FOR RCF 2 ACQUISITION TRUST ; Community Dream Living, Inc.. Fee Amount $ 350.. (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Jones, Linwood)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Att: 2 Joint Order Scheduling Pretrial Proceedings and Trial
Att: 3 Proposed Order