Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:25-bk-00188

Puerto Rico Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Enrique S Lamoutte Inclan
Case #: 3:25-ap-00010
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2025
Terminated:Apr 21, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
David Kivett
Represented By
David Kivett
contact info
Defendant
UBS Financial Services Inc.
Represented By
UBS Financial Services Inc.
contact info
Defendant
CLERK OF THE DISTRICT COURT AS CUSTODIAN OF FUNDS
Represented By
CLERK OF THE DISTRICT COURT AS CUSTODIAN OF FUNDS
contact info
Defendant
JOHN DOE 1-5
Represented By
JOHN DOE 1-5
contact info
Plaintiff
NEOLPHARMA INC
99 JARDINES ST
CAGUAS, PR 00725
Represented By
CARMEN D CONDE TORRES
C. Conde & Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 1:10 PM AST
Monday, April 21, 2025
court Close Adversary Case Mon 04/21 1:36 PM
Adversary Case 3:25-ap-10 Closed . (HERNANDEZ ALEJANDRO, CYBELLE)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
16 16 misc Certificate of service Sat 04/05 12:33 AM
Certificate of service Related [+] Notice Date 04/04/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12
15 15 misc Certificate of service Sat 04/05 12:33 AM
Certificate of service Related [+] Notice Date 04/04/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11
14 14 misc Certificate of service Sat 04/05 12:33 AM
Certificate of service Related [+] Notice Date 04/04/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
13 13 misc Certificate of service Thu 04/03 12:42 AM
Certificate of service Related [+] Notice Date 04/02/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10
12 12 order Judgment Wed 04/02 4:14 PM
JUDGMENT DISMISSING THE CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed on 4/2/2025. Order due by 4/16/2025. Related [+].(HERNANDEZ ALEJANDRO, CYBELLE)
Related: [-] 11
Monday, March 31, 2025
10 10 2 pgs order Order & Notice - General Mon 03/31 11:58 AM
AMENDED ORDER SETTING INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Signed on 3/31/2025. Hearing scheduled 7/14/2025 at 10:00 AM at Microsoft Teams Video & Audio Conferencing and/or Telephonic Hearings. Related [+].(ZAYAS BOUJOUEN, DARHMA)
Related: [-] 7
Friday, March 28, 2025
11 11 order Stipulation Approved Wed 04/02 4:07 PM
ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT/STIPULATION. Signed on 3/28/2025. Related [+].(HERNANDEZ ALEJANDRO, CYBELLE)
Related: [-] 1
Saturday, March 15, 2025
9 9 misc Certificate of service Sun 03/16 12:33 AM
Certificate of service Related [+] Notice Date 03/15/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7
Friday, March 14, 2025
8 8 misc Certificate of service Fri 03/14 5:02 PM
Certificate of service Filed by CARMEN D CONDE TORRES on behalf of NEOLPHARMA INC. Related [+](CONDE TORRES, CARMEN)
Related: [-] 1 ,3 ,4 ,5 ,7
Thursday, March 13, 2025
7 7 order Pretrial Conference Thu 03/13 3:56 PM
ORDER SETTING INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Signed on 3/13/2025. Hearing scheduled 7/10/2025 at 10:00 AM at Microsoft Teams Video & Audio Conferencing and/or Telephonic Hearings. (HERNANDEZ ALEJANDRO, CYBELLE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
6 6 court Summons (Process Form) Tue 03/11 9:23 AM
Summons Issued Related [+]. (APONTE REYES, CARLOS)
Related: [-] 1
5 5 court Summons (Process Form) Tue 03/11 9:22 AM
Summons Issued Related [+]. (APONTE REYES, CARLOS)
Related: [-] 1
4 4 court Summons (Process Form) Tue 03/11 9:21 AM
Summons Issued Related [+]. (APONTE REYES, CARLOS)
Related: [-] 1
3 3 court Summons (Process Form) Tue 03/11 9:21 AM
Summons Issued Related [+]. (APONTE REYES, CARLOS)
Related: [-] 1
Monday, March 10, 2025
2 2 crditcrd Auto docket of credit card Mon 03/10 8:46 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 25-00010 ESL] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A17310104, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/10 8:46 PM
Adversary case 25-00010 91 (Declaratory judgment): Complaint by NEOLPHARMA INC against David Kivett, UBS Financial Services Inc., CLERK OF THE DISTRICT COURT AS CUSTODIAN OF FUNDS, JOHN DOE 1-5. Fee Amount $350 (CONDE TORRES, CARMEN)
Related: [-]