Consolidated
Lead case: 3:25-md-03140

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Hope T Cannon
Case #: 3:25-cv-00254
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2025
Case in other court:Illinois Northern, 1:25-cv-02012
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 5:31 AM EDT
Defendant
GREENSTONE LLC
Defendant
PFIZER INC
Defendant
PHARMACIA & UPJOHN CO LLC
Defendant
PHARMACIA LLC
Defendant
PRASCO LLC
Defendant
VIATRIS INC
Interested Party
JACOB WOODY
Plaintiff
ASHLEY CONCIDINE
Represented By
MELISSA SUZANNE SKILKEN
Weisman Kennedy & Berris Co - Cleveland Oh
contact info
DAVID CHARLES LANDEVER
Weisman Kennedy & Berris Co - Cleveland Oh
contact info
ROBERT ERIC KENNEDY
Weisman Kennedy & Berris Co - Cleveland Oh
contact info
Plaintiff
JENNA CONCIDINE
Represented By
MELISSA SUZANNE SKILKEN
Weisman Kennedy & Berris Co - Cleveland Oh
contact info
DAVID CHARLES LANDEVER
Weisman Kennedy & Berris Co - Cleveland Oh
contact info
ROBERT ERIC KENNEDY
Weisman Kennedy & Berris Co - Cleveland Oh
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
5 5 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:25-cv-02012. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
4 4 TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of Florida the electronic record. (gcy, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/11/2025.]
Related: [-]
3 3 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to Northern District of Florida.(gcy, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/11/2025.]
Related: [-]
***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to MDL 3140 Conditional Transfer Order filed 3/11/25. (gcy, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/11/2025.]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
2 2 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: case reassigned to the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama for all further proceedings pursuant to the provisions of 28 USC 294(b).Mailed notice (gcy, )[Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/11/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Request for Reassignment
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial filed by JENNA CONCIDINE, ASHLEY CONCIDINE; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-23135946.(Skilken, Melissa) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/11/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 2). (mam, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/11/2025.]
Related: [-]
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached[LINK:Consent To] [LINK:form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (mam, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/11/2025.]
Related: [-]