Reese v. MVB Bank Inc.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | J Paul Oetken |
Case #: | 1:25-cv-02026 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 15:1693ef Electronic Fund Transfer Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 11, 2025 |
Last checked: Sunday Apr 27, 2025 5:28 AM EDT |
Defendant
MVB Bank Inc. d/b/a Credit Karma Money
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Devon Reese
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 24, 2025 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 04/24 9:32 AM
ORDER granting12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Granted. Defendant shall move, answer, or otherwise respond to the complaint by May 12, 2025. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (mg) |
|
Wednesday, April 23, 2025 | ||
12 | 12
![]() LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re Complaint addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Thomas M. Mealiffe, Esq. dated April 23, 2025. Document filed by MVB Bank Inc. d/b/a Credit Karma Money..(Mealiffe, Thomas) |
|
Monday, April 07, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 04/07 12:29 PM
ORDER granting10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Granted. Defendant shall move, answer, or otherwise respond to the complaint by April 28, 2025. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (mg) |
|
Tuesday, April 01, 2025 | ||
10 | 10
![]() LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Thomas M. Mealiffe, Esq. dated April 1, 2025. Document filed by MVB Bank Inc. d/b/a Credit Karma Money..(Mealiffe, Thomas) |
|
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Michael Mealiffe on behalf of MVB Bank Inc. d/b/a Credit Karma Money..(Mealiffe, Thomas) |
|
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alicia Johnson-Ishman on behalf of MVB Bank Inc. d/b/a Credit Karma Money..(Johnson-Ishman, Alicia) |
|
Monday, March 24, 2025 | ||
7 | 7
![]() SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. MVB Bank Inc. d/b/a Credit Karma Money served on 3/17/2025, answer due 4/7/2025. Service was accepted by Bryan Blickenstaff, Intake Specialist. Document filed by Devon Reese..(Rubinov, Meir) |
|
Thursday, March 13, 2025 | ||
6 | 6
![]() ORDER: Initial Conference set for 6/18/2025 at 11:30 AM before Judge J. Paul Oetken. Counsel should call (855) 244-8681 at the scheduled time. The attendee ID number is 23128287066. Counsel who appear at the pretrial conference must be authorized to negotiate terms of settlement. Members of the public may join but are instructed to place their phones on mute. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 3/13/2025) (vfr) |
|
Wednesday, March 12, 2025 | ||
5 | 5
![]() ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to MVB Bank Inc. d/b/a Credit Karma Money..(pc) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Wed 03/12 11:13 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Wed 03/12 11:13 AM
Magistrate Judge Gary Stein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Wed 03/12 11:16 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc) |
||
Tuesday, March 11, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Devon Reese..(Rubinov, Meir) |
|
3 | 3
![]() REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MVB Bank Inc. d/b/a Credit Karma Money, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Devon Reese..(Rubinov, Meir) |
|
2 | 2
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rubinov, Meir) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against MVB Bank Inc. d/b/a Credit Karma Money. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30747781)Document filed by Devon Reese..(Rubinov, Meir) |