New York Southern District Court
Judge:J Paul Oetken
Case #: 1:25-cv-02026
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause15:1693ef Electronic Fund Transfer Act
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 27, 2025 5:28 AM EDT
Defendant
MVB Bank Inc. d/b/a Credit Karma Money
Represented By
Thomas Michael Mealiffe
Nixon Peabody LLP
contact info
Alicia Johnson-Ishman
Nixon Peabody LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Devon Reese
Represented By
Meir Rubinov
Consumer Attorneys, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
13 13 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 04/24 9:32 AM
ORDER granting12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Granted. Defendant shall move, answer, or otherwise respond to the complaint by May 12, 2025. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (mg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 04/23 2:30 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re Complaint addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Thomas M. Mealiffe, Esq. dated April 23, 2025. Document filed by MVB Bank Inc. d/b/a Credit Karma Money..(Mealiffe, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
11 11 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 04/07 12:29 PM
ORDER granting10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Granted. Defendant shall move, answer, or otherwise respond to the complaint by April 28, 2025. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (mg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 04/01 2:20 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Thomas M. Mealiffe, Esq. dated April 1, 2025. Document filed by MVB Bank Inc. d/b/a Credit Karma Money..(Mealiffe, Thomas)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/01 1:21 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Michael Mealiffe on behalf of MVB Bank Inc. d/b/a Credit Karma Money..(Mealiffe, Thomas)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/01 1:17 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alicia Johnson-Ishman on behalf of MVB Bank Inc. d/b/a Credit Karma Money..(Johnson-Ishman, Alicia)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 03/24 12:51 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. MVB Bank Inc. d/b/a Credit Karma Money served on 3/17/2025, answer due 4/7/2025. Service was accepted by Bryan Blickenstaff, Intake Specialist. Document filed by Devon Reese..(Rubinov, Meir)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
6 6 2 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Thu 03/13 11:45 AM
ORDER: Initial Conference set for 6/18/2025 at 11:30 AM before Judge J. Paul Oetken. Counsel should call (855) 244-8681 at the scheduled time. The attendee ID number is 23128287066. Counsel who appear at the pretrial conference must be authorized to negotiate terms of settlement. Members of the public may join but are instructed to place their phones on mute. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 3/13/2025) (vfr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 03/12 1:23 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to MVB Bank Inc. d/b/a Credit Karma Money..(pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 03/12 11:13 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 03/12 11:13 AM
Magistrate Judge Gary Stein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 03/12 11:16 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
4 4 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 03/11 1:59 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Devon Reese..(Rubinov, Meir)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 03/11 1:57 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MVB Bank Inc. d/b/a Credit Karma Money, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Devon Reese..(Rubinov, Meir)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 03/11 1:55 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rubinov, Meir)
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 03/11 1:52 PM
COMPLAINT against MVB Bank Inc. d/b/a Credit Karma Money. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30747781)Document filed by Devon Reese..(Rubinov, Meir)
Related: [-]