Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:24-bk-81712

Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Thomas M Lynch
Case #: 3:25-ap-96002
Nature of Suit62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2025
Terminated:Apr 17, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Marsha R Koppien
214 S. Blackstone Ave.
Amboy, IL 61310
Represented By
Marsha R Koppien
contact info
Plaintiff
First National Bank Of Omaha
Represented By
Christopher H Purcell
Sherman & Purcell, Ltd.
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Thursday, April 17, 2025
8 8 court Close Adversary Case Thu 04/17 6:12 AM
Adversary Case 3:25-ap-96002 Closed . Related [+]
Related: [-] ed, Yashica
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
7 7 order Agreed Order Thu 04/17 6:10 AM
Agreed Order and Judgment Related [+]. Signed on 4/16/2025
Related: [-] 1 Complainted, Yashica
6 6 misc Proposed Order Wed 04/16 11:44 AM
Proposed Order - Agreed Order and Judgment Filed by Christopher H Purcell on behalf of First National Bank Of Omaha Related [+]. (Purcell, Christopher)
Related: [-] 4 Stipulation for Judgment
Thursday, March 27, 2025
5 5 misc Proposed Order Thu 03/27 5:45 PM
Proposed Order - and Judgment of Nondischargeablility Filed by Christopher H Purcell on behalf of First National Bank Of Omaha Related [+]. (Purcell, Christopher)
Related: [-] 4 Stipulation for Judgment
4 4 misc Stipulation for Judgment Thu 03/27 5:43 PM
Stipulation for Judgment Filed by Christopher H Purcell on behalf of First National Bank Of Omaha. (Purcell, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
3 3 crditcrd none Mon 03/10 4:51 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 25-96002 ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A49223904. Fee Amount $ 350.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Mon 03/10 3:46 PM
Summons Issued on Marsha R Koppien Answer Due 04/9/2025 (Admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/10 3:46 PM
Adversary case 25-96002 (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)): Complaint by First National Bank Of Omaha against Marsha R Koppien. Fee Amount $350. Status hearing to be held on 4/16/2025 at 11:00 AM at Appear In Courtroom 3100, 327 S. Church St, Rockford, IL 61101 or Using Zoom- Judge Lynch. (Purcell, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Att: 2 Adversary Cover Sheet