Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:24-bk-33216

Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michael E Ridgway
Case #: 3:25-ap-03027
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
TD Bank USA, N.A.
1701 Route 7 East
Cherry Hill, NJ 08003
Plaintiff
Shenaya Elise
5428 Landmark Circle
Mounds View, MN 55112
Represented By
Mark L Vavreck
Vavreck Law Office, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
court Judge Certification under 9028 Tue 04/15 1:37 PM
Judge Katherine A. Constantine certifies familiarity with the record and determines that the case may be completed without prejudice to the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9028, which makes applicable Fed. R. Civ. P. 63, to the extent such certification is required. (LMO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
court Case Reassigned - Judge Tue 04/08 3:37 PM
Judge Katherine A. Constantine added to case. Involvement of Judge Michael E Ridgway terminated. (AMO)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
3 3 court Summons for adversary proceeding Wed 04/02 11:12 AM
Summons issued on TD Bank USA, N.A. Date Issued 4/2/2025, Answer Due 5/2/2025 (HEJ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
2 2 court Summons for adversary proceeding Tue 03/11 8:31 AM
Summons issued on TD Bank USA, N.A. Date Issued 3/11/2025, Answer Due 4/10/2025 (HEJ)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/10 7:08 PM
Adversary case 25-03027 (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))), Complaint without demand for jury trial by Shenaya Elise against TD Bank USA, N.A.. No Fee. (Vavreck, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Disclosure of compensation of attorney for debtor (Local Form 1007-1)
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Retainer Agreement