District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Amy Berman Jackson
Case #: 1:25-cv-00715
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 5:25 AM EDT
Defendant
CAPITAL BANK, N.A.
Represented By
John R. Fischel
Brady, Fischel, & Daily, LLC
contact info
Defendant
CHRISTOPHER J. DONATELLI
Defendant
STEPHEN T. HARRISON
Plaintiff
KAREN DONATELLI
Represented By
Amelia J. Schmidt
Kaiser PLLC
contact info
Third Party Defendant
CHRISTOPHER J. DONATELLI
Third Party Defendant
STEPHEN T. HARRISON
ThirdParty Plaintiff
CAPITAL BANK, N.A.
Represented By
John R. Fischel
Brady, Fischel, & Daily, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, May 19, 2025
notice Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status Mon 05/19 9:50 AM
RESOLVED.....NOTICE of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status re12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re7 Third Party Complaint by STEPHEN T. HARRISON.(O'Brien, Eileen). Your attorney renewal/government certification has not been received. As a result, your membership with the U.S. District & Bankruptcy Courts for the District of Columbia is not in good standing, and you are not permitted to file. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.9, you must immediately correct your membership status by following the appropriate instructions on this page of our website: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-renewal. Please be advised that the presiding judge in this case has been notified that you are currently not in good standing to file in this court. Renewal Due by 5/26/2025. (zapb) Modified on 5/19/2025 (zhcn)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 05/19 10:38 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting12 defendant's consent motion for extension of time. Defendant Stephen Harrison must respond to the third-party complaint by May 30, 2025. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/19/2025. (lcabj1)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 16, 2025
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 05/16 4:13 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re7 Third Party Complaint by STEPHEN T. HARRISON.(O'Brien, Eileen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
order .Order Tue 05/06 12:11 PM
MINUTE ORDER. The Initial Conference currently scheduled for May 7, 2025 is hereby VACATED. The hearing will be reset after service has been completed for all defendants. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/6/2025. (lcabj1)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
11 11 service Summons Returned as to private individual or business Mon 04/28 12:02 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. STEPHEN T. HARRISON served on 4/26/2025, answer due 5/17/2025 (Fischel, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
10 10 misc Meet and Confer Statement Wed 04/23 3:40 PM
MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Schmidt, Amelia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Tue 04/22 5:17 PM
MINUTE ORDER. The Initial Conference currently scheduled for May 1, 2025 is hereby VACATED and RESET for May 7, 2025 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 25A- In Person before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/22/2025. (zdrf)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
order Order on Motion to Continue Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 04/18 2:58 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting9 plaintiff's consent motion to continue. The parties must meet, confer, and file a Joint Report pursuant to Local Rule 16.3 by April 23, 2025. Counsel are further advised that it is not necessary to call chambers to inform the Court about motions pending on its docket at all, much less, non-emergency motions that haven't even been pending for 24 hours. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/18/2025. (lcabj1)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
9 9 motion Continue Thu 04/17 5:49 PM
Consent MOTION to Continue Joint Report Deadline to 4/23/25 by KAREN DONATELLI.(Schmidt, Amelia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
8 8 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 04/17 10:59 AM
SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to CHRISTOPHER J. DONATELLI, STEPHEN T HARRISON.(zdp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
7 7 cmp Third Party Complaint Wed 04/16 3:39 PM
THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against CHRISTOPHER J. DONATELLI, STEPHEN T HARRISON filed by CAPITAL BANK, N.A..(Fischel, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons
order Order on Motion to Continue Set/Reset Hearings Wed 04/16 11:08 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting6 defendant's consent motion to continue. The initial scheduling conference set for April 30, 2025 is hereby VACATED and RESET for May 1, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 25. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/16/2025. (lcabj1)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
6 6 motion Continue Tue 04/15 3:33 PM
Consent MOTION to Continue Initial Status Conference by CAPITAL BANK, N.A..(Fischel, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Consent Motion to Continue PO
Monday, April 07, 2025
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Mon 04/07 4:09 PM
MINUTE ORDER. Meet and Confer Initial Scheduling Conference set for April 30, 2025 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 25. The parties shall meet, confer, and file a Joint Report pursuant to Local Rule 16.3 by April 21, 2025. Any dates contained in the Report should be expressed as specific dates (month/day/year) rather than as time frames (e.g., "60 days after the entry of the scheduling order"). Counsel are directed to contact the Court's Deputy Clerk in the first instance to request the rescheduling of court appearances. The party seeking the change in schedule must first confer with counsel for all other parties and be prepared to provide the Deputy Clerk with proposed mutually agreeable dates. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/7/2025. (lcabj1)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
5 5 notice LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests Wed 04/02 2:33 PM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CAPITAL BANK, N.A. (Fischel, John)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 04/02 2:13 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by CAPITAL BANK, N.A..(Fischel, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
3 3 service Certificate of Service Wed 03/12 9:14 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by KAREN DONATELLI . (Schmidt, Amelia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Tue 03/11 4:20 PM
SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to CAPITAL BANK, N.A..(zmtm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/11 2:56 PM
COMPLAINT against CAPITAL BANK, N.A. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-11533745) filed by Karen Donatelli.(Schmidt, Amelia) (Attachment 3 replaced on 3/11/2025) (zmtm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 (Deed of Trust and Related Documents),
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 (Jennifer Naso Report),
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 03/11 4:17 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zmtm)
Related: [-]