Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-15251

Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michael E Romero
Case #: 1:25-ap-01095
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Taylor English Duma LLP
Represented By
Taylor English Duma LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Simon E. Rodriguez
Represented By
Kevin S. Neiman
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
9 9 order Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Tue 04/15 1:35 PM
Order Granting Unopposed Motion For Extension of Time To Respond to Complaint Taylor English Duma LLP Answer Due 4/30/2025 Related [+]. (sd)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
8 8 motion Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Mon 04/14 8:01 AM
Unopposed Motion For Extension of Time To Respond to Complaint Filed by Solomon Wisenberg on behalf of Taylor English Duma LLP Related [+]. (sd)
Related: [-] 4 Amended Complaint
7 7 utility Notification of Electronic Filing Error (Public Entry) Wed 04/09 5:02 PM
Notice of Electronic Filing Error. Solomon Wisenberg is hereby notified of the following error in docket number 6: Incorrect event . E-Filer shall refile the pleading using the Adversary > Motions > Extend Time To File Answer To Complaint. Failure to timely correct the error may result in the party not receiving the requested relief. (Text Only Entry) Related [+]. Tickle Due Date 4/11/2025. (sd)
Related: [-] 6 Motion
6 6 motion Motion Wed 04/09 1:41 PM
Motion Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Filed by Solomon Wisenberg on behalf of Taylor English Duma LLP. (Wisenberg, Solomon)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
5 5 misc Summons Service Executed (Adversary) Mon 03/10 4:43 PM
Summons Service Executed On: Taylor English Duma LLP; 3/10/25 Filed by Kevin S. Neiman on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez. (Neiman, Kevin)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 03/10 2:34 PM
Amended Complaint Nature of Suit 12 Related [+] by Simon E. Rodriguez against Taylor English Duma LLP. Filed by Kevin S. Neiman on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez. (Neiman, Kevin)
Related: [-] covery of Money/Property - 547 Preference1 Complaint
3 3 court Summons Issued (auto) Mon 03/10 1:43 PM
Summons Issued on Taylor English Duma LLP Answer Due 04/9/2025. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Neiman, Kevin)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Notice of Deferral of Adversary Filing Fee Mon 03/10 1:42 PM
The trustee or debtor-in-possession commencing this proceeding having requested deferral of the filing fee pursuant to paragraph (6) of the Bankruptcy Court Miscellaneous Fee Schedule, the request is hereby GRANTED and the filing fee shall be payable only from the estate and to the extent there is any estate realized. (Admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/10 1:41 PM
Adversary case 25-01095 Complaint by Simon E. Rodriguez against Taylor English Duma LLP. Fee to be Deferred. Adversary Status Deadline 06/9/2025 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Neiman, Kevin)
Related: [-]