Georgia Southern District Court
Judge:J Randal Hall
Referred: Brian K Epps
Case #: 1:25-cv-00044
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 5:33 AM EDT
Defendant
Hide N Seek Towing & Recovery, LLC
Represented By
Marcol David Harvey
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Hailey Pearson
Represented By
Dennis Kurz
Kurz Law Group, LLC
contact info
Yitzchak Zelman
Marcus & Zellman, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
12 12 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 04/29 1:46 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hailey Pearson. MVTrac, LLC waiver sent on 4/29/2025, answer due 6/30/2025. (Zelman, Yitzchak)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 04/28 5:11 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Filed As Of Right against Hide N Seek Towing & Recovery, LLC, MVTrac, LLC, filed by Hailey Pearson.(Zelman, Yitzchak)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
10 10 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1) Mon 04/07 6:06 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1) by Hide N Seek Towing & Recovery, LLC. (Harvey, Marcol)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/07 6:04 PM
DEF HIDE N SEEK RECOVERY, LLC'S ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Hide N Seek Towing & Recovery, LLC.(Harvey, Marcol)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 04/01 10:42 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hailey Pearson. Hide N Seek Towing & Recovery, LLC served on 3/17/2025, answer due 4/7/2025. (Zelman, Yitzchak)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Wed 03/19 1:35 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro hac vice for attorney Yitzchak Zelman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 3/19/25. (wwp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/18 9:38 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Hailey Pearson. Responses due by 4/1/2025.(Kurz, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
utility Motions Referred Tue 03/18 10:35 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED:6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (thb)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Tue 03/18 10:37 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED:4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Yitzchak Zelman, Esq. Receipt Number AGASDC-4019744, Fee Amount $200, (thb)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Filing Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 03/14 12:59 PM
NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re:4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Yitzchak Zelman, Esq. After 2 days a notice of noncompliance will be submitted to a judicial officer. Compliance due by 3/16/2025. (csr)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/14 11:40 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Yitzchak Zelman, Esq. Receipt Number AGASDC-4019744, Fee Amount $200, by Hailey Pearson. Responses due by 3/28/2025.(Kurz, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
3 3 order Rule 26(f) Order Tue 03/11 3:53 PM
RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 3/11/2025. (gmh)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 03/11 3:53 PM
Summons Issued as to Hide N Seek Towing & Recovery, LLC. (gmh)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/11 3:51 PM
COMPLAINT against Hide N Seek Towing & Recovery, LLC, filed by Hailey Pearson. Filing Fee paid, $405.00, Receipt # AGASDC-4017618. (gmh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet