Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Mark Pittman
Case #: 4:25-cv-00237
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2025
Terminated:Apr 22, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 5:38 AM CDT
Defendant
Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By
John W Stilwell
Law Office Of John Stilwell
contact info
Plaintiff
Shawn Andrus
Represented By
Katy L Hart
Law Office Of Matthew Bobo PLLC
contact info
Matthew W Bobo
The Law Office Of Matthew Bobo PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
9 9 misc Stipulation Tue 04/22 11:37 AM
Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Shawn Andrus. (Bobo, Matthew)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case (Optional) Wed 04/23 8:28 AM
Civil Case Terminated per9 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. (saw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
8 8 1 pgs order Order Tue 04/08 2:09 PM
ORDER: no later than April 22, 2025, Defendant shall file the entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Rule 83.10(a). Failure to do so may result in the imposition of sanctions and/or the striking of any filings in this case without further notice. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 4/8/2025) (wxc)
Related: [-]
7 7 5 pgs order Order for Scheduling Order Proposal Tue 04/08 2:01 PM
Order for Scheduling Order Proposal: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 4/22/2025. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 4/8/2025) (wxc)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Fri 04/04 5:11 PM
NOTICE of Vacation filed by Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company (Stilwell, John)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/04 5:04 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,, with Jury Demand filed by Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice.Attorney John W Stilwell added to party Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Stilwell, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
4 4 service Summons Returned Tue 03/18 2:06 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company ; served on 3/17/2025. (Bobo, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 03/14 11:23 AM
Summons Issued as to Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company. (wxc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
2 2 qcref Pittman Fri 03/14 11:22 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (wxc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/11 3:35 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company filed by Shawn Andrus. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number ATXNDC-15330746) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Bobo, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s)