Kentucky Eastern District Court
Judge:Danny C Reeves
Case #: 2:24-cv-00048
Nature of Suit376 Other Statutes - Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Cause31:3730 Qui Tam False Claims Act
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2024
Terminated:Mar 13, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 12, 2025 11:04 PM EDT
Defendant
Boge Rubber & Plastics USA, LLC
Movant
United States of America
Represented By
Meghan Stubblebine, AUSA
U.S. Attorney'S Office, Edky
contact info
Plaintiff
Sidesolve, LLC
Represented By
Jason Marcus
Bracker & Marcus
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, March 28, 2025
21 21 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Unseal Document Fri 03/28 9:10 AM
ORDER: 1. The Motion to Unseal20 is GRANTED. 2. The Clerk of the Court is directed to UNSEAL the United States' Notice regarding intervention15 and the Court's Order16 . Signed by District Judge Danny C Reeves on 3/28/2025. (TDB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
utility Motion Submitted Thu 03/27 9:11 AM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Danny C. Reeves for review: re20 MOTION to Unseal Document by United States of America (SLG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
20 20 motion Unseal Document Wed 03/26 2:01 PM
MOTION to Unseal Document by United States of America(Stubblebine, Meghan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Thursday, March 13, 2025
19 19 2 pgs order Order Term Case Thu 03/13 4:08 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: This action and all claims asserted in the Complaint, are DISMISSED, without prejudice. Parties shall bear their respective costs, fees and expenses. Signed by District Judge Danny C Reeves on 3/13/2025.(TJG)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Other Notice Thu 03/13 1:57 PM
NOTICE by United States of America Consent to Dismissal of the Complaint(Stubblebine, Meghan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Dismissal
17 17 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 03/13 12:26 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Sidesolve, LLC (Marcus, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
16 16 order Sealed Order Tue 03/11 4:08 PM
SEALED ORDER cc: service by U.S. Mail on paper. Signed by District Judge Danny C Reeves on 3/11/2025.(TJG)cc: COR via US Mail
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Filing Tue 03/11 12:30 PM
NOTICE by United States of America.(TJG) Modified text on 3/11/2025 (TJG).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, December 16, 2024
14 14 SEALED ORDER : 1. The United States' motion13 is GRANTED, in part. The United States is granted a second extension through March 31, 2025. 2. The Complaint and all filings will remain under seal through March 31, 2025, subject to intervening orders. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 12/16/2024.(TDB)cc: cc: USA via US Mail
Related: [-]
13 13 EX PARTE MOTION by United States of America(TDB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Danny C. Reeves for review: re13 EX PARTE MOTION by United States of America (TDB)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
12 12 SEALED ORDER : 1) US' motion11 is GRANTED. US is granted an extension through 12/18/2024. 2) The Complaint and all filings will remain under seal through 12/18/2024. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 6/21/2024.(TJG)cc: USA via US Mail
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
11 11 EX PARTE MOTION by United States of America(TJG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Danny C. Reeves for review: re11 EX PARTE MOTION by United States of America (TJG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
10 10 SEALED ORDER : 1) United States' motion9 is GRANTED. 2) The seal is partially lifted. 3) The Complaint, docket entries and all other filings shall remain under seal, except insofar as the seal has been partially lifted by this Court. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 6/13/2024.(TJG)cc: USA via US mail
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
9 9 EX PARTE MOTION(TBB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Danny C. Reeves for review: re9 EX PARTE MOTION (TBB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
8 8 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sidesolve, LLC. (TJG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
7 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Jason Marcus.2 Complaint has been filed by Sidesolve, LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (TJG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
6 6 ORDER: Motion for pro hac vice admission of Jason Marcus3 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 4/4/2024. (TJG)cc: COR
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER: motion to seal1 is GRANTED. The complaint will remain under seal for at least 60 days. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 4/4/2024. (TJG)cc: COR
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION for Jason Marcus to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sidesolve, LLC (TJG). Modified on 4/4/2024 (TJG).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 receipt
2 2 COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED). ( Filing fee $405; receipt number 200001441), filed by Sidesolve, LLC.(TJG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 cover letter,
Att: 3 Receipt
1 1 MOTION to Seal Case by Sidesolve, LLC(TJG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
BAR STATUS Check completed re3 MOTION for Jason Marcus to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sidesolve, LLC. (TJG)
Related: [-]
Conflict Check run. (TJG)
Related: [-]
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Danny C. Reeves for review: re1 MOTION to Seal Case by Sidesolve, LLC,3 MOTION for Jason Marcus to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sidesolve, LLC (TJG)
Related: [-]
NOTICE FOR ATTORNEY TO REQUEST E-Filing Privileges to Jason Marcus: re6 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. A Pro Hac Vice e-Filing request must be processed through your PACER account. IMPORTANT NOTICE: You are required to electronically file and receive electronic service from the court's automated Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system. If you are not a registered Filing User for the Court's ECF system, please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information and/or training. For additional assistance contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. cc: COR and via U.S. Mail to Jason Marcus (TJG)
Related: [-]