California Central District Court
Judge:Percy Anderson
Referred: Alka Sagar
Case #: 2:25-cv-02172
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause05:702 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 2:27 AM PDT
Defendant
United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Oil Appellate
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
Sujan Ediga
Represented By
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Aasritha Pandrangi
Represented By
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Nagaraja Kamalakar Pandrangi
Represented By
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Suneetha Pandrangi
Represented By
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Falguni Raval
Represented By
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Milan Raval
Represented By
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Eva Ropohl
Represented By
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Roman Ropohl
Represented By
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Neethu Sujan
Represented By
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
20 20 order Extending Answer Due Deadline Fri 05/09 1:53 PM
ORDER ON STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT by Judge Percy Anderson. After considering the stipulation of the parties, the request to extend the deadline for Defendant to file an Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint from May 16, 2025 until July 15, 2025, is GRANTED. RE: Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer,19 . (aco)
Related: [-]
19 19 stip Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days) Fri 05/09 8:01 AM
First STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 07/15/2025 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,1 filed by Defendant United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. Related [+]
Related: [-] no, Catherine
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Thursday, May 08, 2025
18 18 notice Appearance Thu 05/08 2:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Catherine McGann Reno on behalf of Defendant United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (Attorney Catherine McGann Reno added to party United States Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft)) Related [+]
Related: [-] no, Catherine
Monday, March 31, 2025
17 17 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Mon 03/31 10:53 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Summons Request,13 , Summons Request,12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Service/Waivers of Summons and Complaints > Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA. Documents attached are Proofs of Service and not requests for Summons.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (aco)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
16 16 service Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA Thu 03/27 12:57 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Eva Ropohl, Nagaraja Kamalakar Pandrangi, Roman Ropohl, Sujan Ediga, Falguni Raval, Neethu Sujan, Suneetha Pandrangi, Milan Raval, Aasritha Pandrangi, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to R. Childress. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Unknown. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Unknown. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA Thu 03/27 12:55 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Eva Ropohl, Nagaraja Kamalakar Pandrangi, Roman Ropohl, Sujan Ediga, Falguni Raval, Neethu Sujan, Suneetha Pandrangi, Milan Raval, Aasritha Pandrangi, upon Plaintiff Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to R. Childress. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Unknown. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Uknown. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA Thu 03/27 12:52 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Eva Ropohl, Nagaraja Kamalakar Pandrangi, Roman Ropohl, Sujan Ediga, Falguni Raval, Neethu Sujan, Suneetha Pandrangi, Milan Raval, Aasritha Pandrangi, upon Plaintiff Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to R. Childress. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Unknown. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Unknown. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Summons Request Thu 03/27 12:47 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,1 filed by plaintiffs Sujan Ediga, Aasritha Pandrangi, Nagaraja Kamalakar Pandrangi, Suneetha Pandrangi, Falguni Raval, Milan Raval, Eva Ropohl, Roman Ropohl, Neethu Sujan. (Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Summons Request Thu 03/27 12:45 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,1 filed by plaintiffs Sujan Ediga, Aasritha Pandrangi, Nagaraja Kamalakar Pandrangi, Suneetha Pandrangi, Falguni Raval, Milan Raval, Eva Ropohl, Roman Ropohl, Neethu Sujan. (Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
11 11 order Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form Thu 03/27 9:54 AM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed as to USA,,,9 by Judge Percy Anderson. The document is stricken. (aco)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
10 10 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Tue 03/25 8:12 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed as to USA,,,9 . The following error(s) was/were found: There are multiple Proofs of Service attached to the docket entry. Each Proof of Service should have its own docket entry. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (aco)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
9 9 service Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA Mon 03/24 1:27 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Eva Ropohl, Nagaraja Kamalakar Pandrangi, Roman Ropohl, Sujan Ediga, Falguni Raval, Neethu Sujan, Suneetha Pandrangi, Milan Raval, Aasritha Pandrangi, upon Defendant United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 3/20/2025, answer due 5/19/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Illegible. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Illegible. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Illegible. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached.(Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-C - Proof of Service
Sunday, March 16, 2025
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Sun 03/16 8:05 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendants United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
7 7 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 03/14 2:23 PM
STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Thu 03/13 6:18 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 03/13 6:17 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
4 4 notice Summons Request Tue 03/11 8:08 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,1 filed by Plaintiffs Milan Raval, Falguni Raval, Nagaraja Kamalakar Pandrangi, Suneetha Pandrangi, Aasritha Pandrangi, Eva Ropohl, Roman Ropohl, Neethu Sujan, Sujan Ediga.(Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons to the United States Attorney General,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons to the United States Attorney's Office
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 03/11 8:06 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Milan Raval, Falguni Raval, Nagaraja Kamalakar Pandrangi, Suneetha Pandrangi, Aasritha Pandrangi, Eva Ropohl, Roman Ropohl, Neethu Sujan, Sujan Ediga, identifying N/A. (Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 03/11 8:05 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Milan Raval, Falguni Raval, Nagaraja Kamalakar Pandrangi, Suneetha Pandrangi, Aasritha Pandrangi, Eva Ropohl, Roman Ropohl, Neethu Sujan, Sujan Ediga. (Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 03/11 8:04 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39278760 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiffs Eva Ropohl, Nagaraja Kamalakar Pandrangi, Roman Ropohl, Sujan Ediga, Falguni Raval, Neethu Sujan, Milan Raval, Suneetha Pandrangi, Aasritha Pandrangi. (Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party Milan Raval(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party Falguni Raval(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party Nagaraja Kamalakar Pandrangi(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party Suneetha Pandrangi(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party Aasritha Pandrangi(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party Eva Ropohl(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party Roman Ropohl(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party Neethu Sujan(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party Sujan Ediga(pty:pla))(Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declarations of Eliel Aguilera,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Letter from Ur M. Jaddou to the American Immigration Lawyers Association,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - USCIS Alert,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet