Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 7:25-mj-00454
Case Filed:Mar 09, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 12, 2025 2:23 AM CDT
Defendant
Carlos Canil-Chitic (1)
Represented By
Vanessa Mendoza
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Federal Public Defender - McAllen
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Cahal Patrick McColgan
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/12/2025 4:25 AM CDT
Saturday, March 08, 2025
Arrest of Carlos Canil-Chitic, filed. (cb7)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 09, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Carlos Canil-Chitic (1), filed. (Starr) Initial Appearance set for 3/10/2025 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis (ngb7) (ngb7).
Related: [-]