Georgia Middle District Court
Case #: 5:25-mj-00020
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2025
Terminated:Mar 10, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 12, 2025 3:16 AM EDT
Plaintiff
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By
WILLIAM KEYES
United States Attorneys Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
JOSEPH E SLEDGE (1)
Terminated: 03/10/2025
Represented By
FEDERAL DEFENDERS MIDDLE DISTRICT OF GEORGIA INC
contact info
CATHERINE M WILLIAMS
Federal Defenders Of Md Ga
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/12/2025 5:13 AM EDT
Monday, March 10, 2025
Initial Appearance - Rule 32.1 set for 3/10/2025 02:30 PM in Macon before US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE.NOTICE OF SETTING HEARING as to JOSEPH E SLEDGE. (cma)
Related: [-]
Arrest Rule 32.1 of JOSEPH E SLEDGE (cma)
Related: [-]
Notice to Eastern Tennessee of a Rule 5 or Rule 32 Initial Appearance as to JOSEPH E SLEDGE. Your case number is: 1:09-cr-00178. Using your PACER account, you may retrieve the docket sheet and any text-only entry via the case number link. The following document link(s) is also provided:3 Order Appointing Counsel, Arrest - Rule 5/Rule 32.1,6 Order of Transfer/Commitment to Another District, Notice of Hearing,5 Waiver of Hearing,2 Financial Affidavit - CJA23,1 Rule 5(c)(3)/Rule 32.1 Documents Received, 4 Initial Appearance - Rule 32.1, Preliminary Hearing, Removal Hearing, Detention Hearing. If you require certified copies of any documents, please send a request to help@GAMD.uscourts.gov. If you wish to designate a different email address for future transfers, send your request to InterDistrictTransfer_TXND@txnd.uscourts.gov. (cma)
Related: [-]
1 1 Rule 32.1 Documents Received as to JOSEPH E SLEDGE: Docket Sheet.(cma)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Judgment in a Criminal Case,
Att: 2 Petition for Warrant for Offender Under Supervision,
Att: 3 Warrant for Arrest
2 2 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by JOSEPH E SLEDGE (cma)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER appointing Federal Defenders of the Middle District of Georgia, Inc. to represent JOSEPH E SLEDGE. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE on 03/10/2025. (cma)
Related: [-]
4 4 TEXT ONLY Minute Entry (content for administrative purposes only) for proceedings held before US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE: Initial Appearance in Rule 32.1 Proceedings as to JOSEPH E SLEDGE held on 3/10/2025; allegations stated for the record; defendant advised of rights and the Court appointed an attorney upon finding defendant eligible; Defendant requests appointed counsel in charging district; Preliminary Hearing as to JOSEPH E SLEDGE on 3/10/2025 was waived; Defendant waives Preliminary Hearing in this district and reserves the right to all hearings in the charging district and tendered an executed Waiver; Removal Hearing as to JOSEPH E SLEDGE held on 3/10/2025; Identity of Defendant is Confirmed, Proper Documents Confirmed Received; the Court finds removal to charging district is appropriate; defendant reserves the right to all hearings in the charging district; Detention Hearing as to JOSEPH E SLEDGE on 3/10/2025 was waived; Defendant consents to be transported to charging district; Defendant is ordered removed to the district of prosecution and remanded to USMS for transport to charging district. AUSA: Shelby Brunette; DEFENSE: Catherine M. Williams; USPO: Megan Howdeshell. Court Reporter: FTR Gold 2:54 p.m..Time in Court: 5 minutes. (cma)
Related: [-]
5 5 Waiver of 32.1 Hearing (Violation of Probation or Supervised Release) as to JOSEPH E SLEDGE. (cma)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER OF TRANSFER/COMMITMENT TO ANOTHER DISTRICT as to JOSEPH E SLEDGE. Defendant committed to District of Eastern District of Tennessee (Chattanooga). Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE on 03/10/2025. (cma)
Related: [-]