Oregon District Court
Judge:Adrienne Nelson
Case #: 3:25-cv-00413
Nature of Suit443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 21, 2025 2:45 AM PDT
Defendant
Guardian Management LLC
Represented By
Nicholas Beyer
Davis Rothwell Earle & Xochihua, PC
contact info
Christopher J. Drotzmann
Davis Rothwell Earle & Xochihua, PC
contact info
Defendant
Rockwood 10 Limited Partnership
Represented By
Nicholas Beyer
Davis Rothwell Earle & Xochihua, PC
contact info
Christopher J. Drotzmann
Davis Rothwell Earle & Xochihua, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kim Hendricks
783 SE 185th #335 335
Portland, OR 97233
Plaintiff
Ladonna Richardson
783 SE 185th #335
Portland, OR 97233


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
12 12 order Show Cause Fri 05/09 4:39 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiffs are ordered to show cause in writing by June 6, 2025, why the complaint should not be dismissed for failure to state a claim and for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Alternatively, plaintiffs may file an amended complaint by that date that fixes all of the deficiencies described in this order. If Richardson is named as a plaintiff, that complaint must be signed by Richardson or, if Richardson cannot represent herself, by counsel on behalf of Richardson. Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP, ECF10 , and Amended Application for Leave to Proceed IFP, ECF11 , are DENIED with leave to renew. Plaintiffs must file a second amended application for leave to proceed IFP that complies with the requirements described above or, in the alternative, pay the filing fee by June 6, 2025. The Court defers ruling on the Motion for Appointment of Counsel, ECF8 , pending filing of an amended complaint or response to the order to show cause. Signed on 5/9/2025 by Judge Adrienne Nelson. (joha)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
11 11 motion Application for Leave to Proceed IFP Mon 04/21 7:54 AM
Amended Application for Leave to Proceed IFP . Filed by Kim Hendricks. (Hendricks, Kim)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 04/01 12:07 PM
Answer to Complaint . Filed by Kim Hendricks. (Hendricks, Kim)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Order Tue 04/01 10:06 AM
ORDER: The Court defers ruling on the Motion for Appointment of Counsel, ECF8 , until plaintiffs file an amended Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis as directed in the Court's order of March 24, 2025, ECF 5 , or pay the filing fee. Ordered by Judge Adrienne Nelson. (jro)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
8 8 motion Motion - Miscellaneous Fri 03/28 1:43 PM
Motion . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Hendricks, Kim)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Application for CMECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party - FORM EVENT Thu 03/27 3:51 PM
ORDER: Granting Application of Kim Hendricks for CM/ECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party (ECF No.6 . Signed on 3/27/2025 by Judge Adrienne Nelson. (gw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
6 6 motion Application for CM/ECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party Wed 03/26 2:55 PM
Application for CM/ECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party. Filed by Kim Hendricks. (dino)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
5 5 order Order on Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed IFP FORM EVENT Mon 03/24 4:19 PM
ORDER: Plaintiffs' Application for Leave to Proceed IFP, ECF1 , is DENIED without prejudice and with leave to renew. A plaintiff who wishes to proceed in forma pauperis must file an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, available at https://ord.uscourts.gov/index.php/representing-yourself/information-about-representing-yourself. The Court may authorize the filing of a complaint "without prepayment of fees" by a person who is unable to pay such fees and "submits an affidavit that includes a statement of all assets" demonstrating their inability to pay. 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(1). Plaintiffs submitted the Short Form Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees and wrote "N/A" in response to each question. These responses are not sufficient for the Court to determine if plaintiffs are unable to pay the filing fee. If plaintiffs wish to proceed they must either complete and submit a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, not the Short Form, with complete responses, or submit the filing fee within thirty days of this order. Ordered by Judge Adrienne Nelson. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 3/24/2025.) (kms)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
4 4 notice Attorney Appearance Thu 03/20 3:04 PM
Notice of Appearance of Christopher J. Drotzmann, Nicholas Beyer appearing on behalf of Rockwood 10 Limited Partnership, Guardian Management LLC . Filed by on behalf of Rockwood 10 Limited Partnership, Guardian Management LLC. (Drotzmann, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
3 3 oth_evt Case Assignment Notice - FORM EVENT Tue 03/11 4:13 PM
Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Adrienne Nelson. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 3/11/25.) (sb)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
2 2 cmp Complaint Tue 03/11 4:12 PM
Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Kim Hendricks against Guardian Management LLC, Rockwood 10 Limited Partnership. (sb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
1 1 motion Application for Leave to Proceed IFP Tue 03/11 4:11 PM
Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Kim Hendricks. (sb)
Related: [-]