Connecticut District Court
Judge:Sarala V Nagala
Case #: 3:25-cv-00354
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 26, 2025 4:46 AM EDT
Defendant
Swing Completo LLC
Plaintiff
Paul Martinka
Represented By
Craig B. Sanders
Sanders Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 56 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
18 18 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 04/30 4:24 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Paul Martinka (Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
17 17 order Order Mon 04/28 11:48 AM
ORDER. As Plaintiff reports that the parties have reached a settlement and need 45 days to document and perform their settlement obligations, see ECF No.16 , the Court holds all deadlines in this matter in abeyance for 45 days until June 12, 2025 . By that date, the parties shall file either a stipulation of dismissal, or Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Plaintiff shall send a copy of this order to Defendant and docket notice of compliance with this order by May 2, 2025 . Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 4/28/2025. (Webb, E)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
16 16 notice Notice of Settlement Fri 04/25 10:54 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Paul Martinka (Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
15 15 order Order Mon 04/21 1:14 PM
ORDER. The Court has received Plaintiff's filing at ECF No.14 ; however, it is unclear based on that filing whether Plaintiff is seeking a 45-day stay of the case to permit negotiation with Defendant, or if Plaintiff is requesting a continuance on behalf of Defendant, which has not yet appeared in this matter. Regardless, if Plaintiff is seeking to stay the case, he must file a properly supported motion to stay. Alternatively, if Defendant is seeking an extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint, Defendant must enter an appearance and file a motion for extension of time. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 4/21/2025. (Webb, E)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
14 14 misc Status Report Fri 04/18 4:46 PM
STATUS REPORT by Paul Martinka. (Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
13 13 service Certificate of Service Thu 04/17 5:49 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paul Martinka re 12 Order,, (Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
12 12 order Order Mon 04/14 7:42 PM
ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S FAILURE TO ANSWER OR TIMELY RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Defendant was required to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint by April 10, 2025. See ECF No. 11. The Court will sua sponte extend the deadline for Defendant to respond to April 21, 2025 . If Defendant does not answer or otherwise respond by that deadline, the Court will direct Plaintiff to move for entry of default against Defendant. Plaintiff shall send a copy of this order to Defendant and docket notice of compliance with this order by April 17, 2025 . Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 4/14/2025. (Webb, E)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Deadline Tue 04/15 12:10 PM
Answer deadline updated for Swing Completo LLC to 4/21/2025. (Bergeson, S)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 03/20 1:11 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul Martinka. Swing Completo LLC served on 3/20/2025, answer due 4/10/2025. (Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
10 10 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 03/13 10:43 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Swing Completo LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Craig B. Sanders* *Sanders Law Group* *333 Earle Ovington Boulevard Suite 402* *Uniondale, NY 11553*. (Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
9 9 order Electronic Service Documents Thu 03/13 10:41 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 4 Notice re: Disclosure Statement,5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines,6 Electronic Filing Order,8 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction,7 Standing Protective Order,1 Complaint, filed by Paul Martinka Signed by Clerk on 3/12/2025.(Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake) Thu 03/13 10:39 AM
Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Standing Protective Order (Intake) Thu 03/13 10:38 AM
Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 3/12/2025.(Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Electronic Filing Order Thu 03/13 10:27 AM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 3/12/2025.(Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Pretrial Deadlines Thu 03/13 10:25 AM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/12/2025 Discovery due by 9/11/2025 Dispositive Motions due by 10/16/2025 Signed by Clerk on 3/12/2025.(Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice re: Disclosure Statement Wed 03/12 10:03 AM
Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 3/12/25.(Hushin, Z.)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement Wed 03/12 9:41 AM
Disclosure Statement by Paul Martinka. (Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Report on Copyright Form Wed 03/12 9:38 AM
AO 121 Report on the re: Copyright Form Completed. (Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 03/12 9:18 AM
COMPLAINT against Swing Completo LLC ( Filing fee $405 receipt number ACTDC-8094340.), filed by Paul Martinka.(Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Original Photograph,
Att: 2 Exhibit Infringing Uses of the Photograph,
Att: 3 Exhibit DMCA Screengrab Infringement,
Att: 4 Supplement Civil Cover Sheet
service Request to Issue Summons Wed 03/12 9:37 AM
Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Swing Completo LLC. (Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
utility NEW Case Assignment Wed 03/12 10:43 AM
CASE ASSIGNMENT: District Judge Sarala V. Nagala assigned to the case. If the District Judge issues an Order of Referral to a Magistrate Judge for any matter other than settlement, the matter will be referred to Magistrate Judge S. Dave Vatti. (Oliver, T.)
Related: [-]