Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:S Maurice Hicks, Jr
Referred: Carol B Whitehurst
Case #: 6:25-cv-00301
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 26, 2025 3:51 AM CDT
Defendant
Eminent Oilfield Services L L C
Plaintiff
Marco Verch
Represented By
John E W Baay, II
Laborde Siegel
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
5 5 service Affidavit of Service Tue 04/01 3:14 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons-Complaint served on Eminent Oilfield Service c/o Daniel Ladd on 3 26-2025 filed by Marco Verch. (aty,Baay, John)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 04/01 3:47 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marco Verch. Eminent Oilfield Services L L C served on 3/26/2025, answer due 4/16/2025. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY as document electronically filed in error as 5 Affidavit of Service. (crt,Crick, S) Modified on 4/1/2025 to add document number. (Crick, S)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued - All (Form Included) Wed 03/12 10:42 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Eminent Oilfield Services L L C. (crt,Crick, S)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility AO 121 Report Regarding a Copyright Wed 03/12 10:35 AM
AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. (crt,Crick, S)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Docket Sheet,
Att: 2 Complaint
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 03/12 9:42 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Marco Verch. (aty,Baay, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 03/12 9:34 AM
COMPLAINT against Eminent Oilfield Services L L C (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-6212694) filed by Marco Verch.(Attorney John E W Baay, II added to party Marco Verch(pty:pla))(aty,Baay, John) Modified on 3/12/2025 to remove reference to jury demand since not contained in pleading. (Crick, S)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Proposed summons/writ,
Att: 4 Civil cover sheet,
Att: 5 AO 121 Register of Copyrights
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 03/12 10:09 AM
CASE Assigned to Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Crick, S)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Corrective Action Wed 03/12 10:13 AM
NOTICE of Corrective Action to John E W Baay, II on behalf of Marco Verch regarding1 Complaint,. Action taken: Docket text modified to remove jury demand from docket entry & court's docket since jury demand was not reflected in pleading filed. (crt,Crick, S)
Related: [-]