Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Nora Barry Fischer
Case #: 2:25-cv-00361
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 26, 2025 7:53 AM EDT
Defendant
CORNER VIEW NURSING AND REHABILITATION CENTER
Plaintiff
RAIONA OAKES
Represented By
Graham Baird
Law Office Of Eric A. Shore
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, April 18, 2025
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 04/18 9:11 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RAIONA OAKES. CORNER VIEW NURSING AND REHABILITATION CENTER waiver sent on 3/13/2025, answer due 5/12/2025. (Baird, Graham)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
5 5 2 pgs order Order Tue 03/25 9:00 AM
ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions. Details more fully stated in Order. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 3/25/2025. (lyk)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs order Order Tue 03/25 9:00 AM
ORDER RE: Motions Practice. Details more fully stated in Order. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 3/25/2025. (lyk)
Related: [-]
3 3 adr Notice of ADR Designation Tue 03/25 8:59 AM
NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (lyk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 03/12 3:00 PM
Summons Issued as to CORNER VIEW NURSING AND REHABILITATION CENTER (keh)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp ATTORNEY Complaint (Credit Card Required) Wed 03/12 11:45 AM
COMPLAINT against CORNER VIEW NURSING AND REHABILITATION CENTER (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8748882), filed by RAIONA OAKES. (Baird, Graham)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Summons
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 03/12 2:52 PM
Judge Nora Barry Fischer added. (keh)
Related: [-]