California Central District Court
Judge:Dale S Fischer
Referred: Margo A Rocconi
Case #: 2:25-cv-02183
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Personal Injury
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2025
Case in other court:Los Angeles County Superior Court, 25STCV03668
Last checked: Saturday Apr 26, 2025 2:41 AM PDT
Defendant
Michael Patrick Carroll
Represented By
Andrew B Brettler
Berk Brettler LLP
contact info
Jake Anthony Camara
Berk Brettler LLP
contact info
Defendant
MPC Partnership Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Carla A Reeves
Goulston And Storrs
contact info
William J. Brown, Jr.
Brown Wegner LLP
contact info
Jennifer Furey
Goulston And Storrs PC
contact info
Matthew K Wegner
Brown Wegner LLP
contact info
Victoria Mariconti
Goulston And Storrs
contact info
Defendant
Does
Defendant
The RMR Group LLC
Represented By
Carla A Reeves
Goulston And Storrs
contact info
William J. Brown, Jr.
Brown Wegner LLP
contact info
Jennifer Furey
Goulston And Storrs PC
contact info
Matthew K Wegner
Brown Wegner LLP
contact info
Victoria Mariconti
Goulston And Storrs
contact info
Plaintiff
Maurice Holloway
Represented By
Justin H Sanders
Sanders Roberts LLP
contact info
Reginald Roberts, Jr
Sanders Roberts LLP
contact info
Navdeep Kumar Singh
Sanders Roberts LLP
contact info
Jason S Ziven
Sanders Roberts LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
34 34 motion Appear Thu 04/24 2:09 PM
REQUEST for Leave of Jennifer B. Furey to Appear for Remote Appearance of Lead Counsel at May 19, 2025 Scheduling Conference filed by defendants MPC Partnership Holdings, LLC, The RMR Group LLC. (Brown, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
33 33 motion Appear Tue 04/22 3:49 PM
REQUEST for Leave of Lead Counsel to Appear for Remotely at May 19, 2025 Scheduling Conference filed by Plaintiff Maurice Holloway. (Sanders, Justin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
32 32 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 04/16 12:49 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants MPC Partnership Holdings, LLC, The RMR Group LLC, identifying The RMR Group Inc.; ABP Holdings LLC; ABP Trust; The Vanguard Group, Inc.; BlackRock Institutional Trust Company, N.A.; Hotchkis and Wiley Capital Management, LLC; Adam D. Portnoy and the Diane Portnoy 2019 Revocable Trust. (Brown, William)
Related: [-]
31 31 answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Wed 04/16 12:42 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition28 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants MPC Partnership Holdings, LLC, The RMR Group LLC.(Brown, William)
Related: [-]
30 30 answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Wed 04/16 8:07 AM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition28 with JURY DEMAND filed by defendant Michael Patrick Carroll.(Brettler, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Independent Contractor Agreement)
Monday, April 14, 2025
29 29 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Mon 04/14 4:04 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 5/19/2025 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (doc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
28 28 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Wed 04/02 4:21 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Plaintiff Maurice Holloway(Sanders, Justin)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
27 27 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Fri 03/21 8:40 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jason S Ziven counsel for Plaintiff Maurice Holloway. Adding Navdeep K. Singh as counsel of record for Maurice Holloway for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Maurice Holloway. (Ziven, Jason)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Objection Fri 03/21 8:34 PM
OBJECTIONS to Notice of Related Case(s)4 filed by Plaintiff Maurice Holloway. (Ziven, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
25 25 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Thu 03/20 11:24 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Michael Patrick Carroll, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only,,24 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER served on March 20, 2025. (Brettler, Andrew)
Related: [-]
24 24 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 03/20 10:40 AM
STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (eo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
23 23 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/19 2:08 PM
ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting18 Non-Resident Attorney Carla A. Reeves APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants MPC Partnership Holdings, LLC, The RMR Group LLC, designating William J. Brown, Jr. as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (sbou)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/19 1:46 PM
ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting17 Non-Resident Attorney Victoria C. Mariconti APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants MPC Partnership Holdings, LLC, The RMR Group LLC, designating William J. Brown, Jr. as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (sbou)
Related: [-]
21 21 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Wed 03/19 12:35 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The RMR Group LLC answer now due 4/2/2025; MPC Partnership Holdings, LLC answer now due 4/2/2025, re Complaint - (Discovery), Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by defendants The RMR Group LLC; MPC Partnership Holdings, LLC.(Brown, William)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/19 11:58 AM
ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting16 Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer B. Furey APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants MPC Partnership Holdings, LLC, The RMR Group LLC, designating William J. Brown, Jr. as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (sbou)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
19 19 answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Tue 03/18 11:17 AM
ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), with JURY DEMAND filed by defendant Michael Patrick Carroll.(Brettler, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Independent Contractor Agreement)
18 18 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Tue 03/18 10:40 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Carla A. Reeves to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants MPC Partnership Holdings, LLC, The RMR Group LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-39321189) filed by defendants MPC Partnership Holdings, LLC, The RMR Group LLC. (Brown, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
17 17 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Tue 03/18 10:32 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Victoria C. Mariconti to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants MPC Partnership Holdings, LLC, The RMR Group LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-39321028) filed by defendants MPC Partnership Holdings, LLC, The RMR Group LLC. (Brown, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
16 16 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Tue 03/18 10:23 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer B. Furey to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants MPC Partnership Holdings, LLC, The RMR Group LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-39320827) filed by defendants MPC Partnership Holdings, LLC, The RMR Group LLC. (Brown, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, March 14, 2025
15 15 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Fri 03/14 2:19 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Michael Patrick Carroll, Judge Fischer's Standing Order served on March 14, 2025. (Brettler, Andrew)
Related: [-]
14 14 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Fri 03/14 11:23 AM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Victoria Mariconti on behalf of Defendants. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
Related: [-]
13 13 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Fri 03/14 11:22 AM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Carla A Reeves on behalf of Defendants. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
Related: [-]
12 12 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Fri 03/14 11:21 AM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer Furey on behalf of Defendants. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 03/14 11:02 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
10 10 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 03/14 11:01 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 03/14 11:01 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Thu 03/13 4:17 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney William J. Brown, Jr counsel for Defendants MPC Partnership Holdings, LLC, RMR Group LLC. Adding William J. Brown, Jr. as counsel of record for MPC PARTNERSHIP HOLDINGS LLC; THE RMR GROUP LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendants MPC PARTNERSHIP HOLDINGS LLC; THE RMR GROUP LLC. (Attorney William J. Brown, Jr added to party MPC Partnership Holdings, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney William J. Brown, Jr added to party RMR Group LLC(pty:dft))(Brown, William)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Joinder Thu 03/13 3:25 PM
JOINDER filed by Defendants MPC Partnership Holdings, LLC, RMR Group LLC joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 . (Brown, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
6 6 notice Appearance Wed 03/12 10:57 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jake Anthony Camara on behalf of Defendant Michael Patrick Carroll (Attorney Jake Anthony Camara added to party Michael Patrick Carroll(pty:dft))(Camara, Jake)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Disclosure Wed 03/12 10:29 AM
DISCLOSURE of Diversity pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a)(2) filed by Defendant Michael Patrick Carroll (Brettler, Andrew)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Related Case(s) Wed 03/12 10:25 AM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by defendant Michael Patrick Carroll. Related Case(s): 25-cv-01583-HDV-ARG (Brettler, Andrew)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 03/12 10:20 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Michael Patrick Carroll, (Brettler, Andrew)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 03/12 10:18 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Michael Patrick Carroll. (Brettler, Andrew)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 03/12 10:15 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 25STCV03668 Receipt No: ACACDC-39280830 - Fee: $405, filed by defendant Michael Patrick Carroll., #7 Declaration of Michael Patrick Carroll) (Attorney Andrew B Brettler added to party Michael Patrick Carroll(pty:dft))(Brettler, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Complaint),
Att: 2 Exhibit B (Summons),
Att: 3 Exhibit C (Civil Case Cover Sheet),
Att: 4 Exhibit D (ADR Information Package),
Att: 5 Exhibit E (Notice of Case Assignment),
Att: 6 Exhibit F (Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt)
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Fri 03/14 11:15 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Michael Patrick Carroll, Does 1 through 50,inclusive, MPC Partnership Holdings, LLC, The RMR Group LLC.Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Maurice Holloway. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/10/2025 SUBMITTED ATTACHED NOTICE OF REMOVAL) (ghap)
Related: [-]
service Notice and Acknowledgment of Service (CV-21) Executed Fri 03/14 11:19 AM
NON CONFORM COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Maurice Holloway, upon Defendant Michael Patrick Carroll acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 2/26/2025, answer due 3/19/2025. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Andrew Brettler, Attorney for defendant Michael Patrick Carroll. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT G) (ghap)
Related: [-]