Consolidated
Lead case: 3:25-md-03140

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Hope T Cannon
Case #: 3:25-cv-00258
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2025
Case in other court:Delaware, 1:25-cv-00226
Last checked: Saturday Apr 26, 2025 5:23 AM EDT
Defendant
PFIZER INC
Defendant
PHARMACIA & UPJOHN CO LLC
Defendant
PHARMACIA LLC
Interested Party
JACOB WOODY
Plaintiff
DODY M WUBKER
Represented By
GLENN D KOHLES, JR
Sbaiti & Company Nj Llc - Newark Nj
contact info
ASIM M BADARUZZAMAN
Sbaiti & Company Nj Llc - Newark Nj
contact info
PAIGE JESSICA ALDERSON
Scott & Scott Llp - Wilmington De
contact info
SINDHU SUSAN DANIEL
Scott And Scott Llp - Wilmington De
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Monday, April 07, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/07 1:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by PAIGE JESSICA ALDERSON on behalf of DODY M. WUBKER (ALDERSON, PAIGE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/27 2:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ASIM M BADARUZZAMAN on behalf of DODY M. WUBKER (BADARUZZAMAN, ASIM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/26 9:20 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by GLENN D KOHLES, JR on behalf of DODY M. WUBKER (KOHLES, GLENN)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/21 9:11 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by SINDHU SUSAN DANIEL on behalf of DODY M. WUBKER (DANIEL, SINDHU)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
6 6 NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION as to Paige Jessica Alderson. Non-Florida Bar members must seek pro hac vice admission. For this multidistrict litigation, please consult the modified admissions requirements described in Pretrial Order No. 4 (Case No. 3:25-md-3140, ECF No. 6). (notice mailed to counsel at Scott & Scott Attorneys at Law LLP 222 Delaware Avenue Suite 1050 Wilmington, DE 19801 and emailed.) (djb)
Related: [-]
5 5 Case transferred in from District of Delaware; Case Number 1:25-cv-00226. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Case transferred to the Northern District of Florida as part of MDL No. 3140. (mws) [Transferred from Delaware on 3/12/2025.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
4 4 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-5) by the UNITED STATES JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION RE: MDL 3140 (mws) [Transferred from Delaware on 3/12/2025.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
3 3 STANDING ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING IN ALL CASES (mws) [Transferred from Delaware on 3/12/2025.]
Related: [-]
Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) [Transferred from Delaware on 3/12/2025.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
2 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (oam) [Transferred from Delaware on 3/12/2025.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Pfizer Inc., Pharmacia & Upjohn Co. LLC, Pharmacia LLC (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADEDC-4623885) - filed by Dody M. Wubker.(oam) [Transferred from Delaware on 3/12/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
No Summons Issued. (oam) [Transferred from Delaware on 3/12/2025.]
Related: [-]