Connecticut District Court
Judge:Robert N Chatigny
Case #: 3:25-cv-00357
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 26, 2025 4:47 AM EDT
Defendant
Makita USA, Inc
Represented By
Holly M. Polglase
Clyde & Co LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Oscar Martinez
Represented By
John T. Bochanis
Daly, Weihing & Bochanis
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
18 18 order Scheduling Order Mon 04/28 2:51 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Please read full text of attached Order for details. Discovery due by 10/2/2026; Initial Status Report due by 5/28/2025; Prefiling Conference Request Re: Dispositive motions due 8/18/2026; Settlement Conference 11/2026; Trial Ready Date 1/11/2027; Trial Brief due by 12/4/2026. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 4/28/2025. (Rickevicius, L.)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
17 17 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Fri 04/25 3:51 PM
Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Polglase, Holly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Wed 04/02 1:39 PM
Defendant Makita U.S.A., Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Affirmative Defenses and Demand for Jury Trial by Makita USA, Inc.(Polglase, Holly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
15 15 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 03/18 6:58 AM
ORDER granting14 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to 4/2/2025 to respond to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 3/18/2025. (Rickevicius, L.)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Deadline Tue 03/18 6:59 AM
Answer deadline updated for Makita USA, Inc to 4/2/2025. (Rickevicius, L.)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
14 14 motion Extension of Time Mon 03/17 6:09 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until April 2, 2025 Assented-To for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Makita USA, Inc. (Polglase, Holly)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Electronic Service Documents Mon 03/17 12:09 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of10 Electronic Filing Order,12 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction,1 Notice of Removal, filed by Makita USA, Inc,11 Standing Protective Order,9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Clerk on 3/17/2025. (Mendez, D)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 STANDING ORDER ON REMOVED CASES
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
12 12 misc Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake) Mon 03/17 12:08 PM
Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Mendez, D)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Standing Protective Order (Intake) Mon 03/17 12:06 PM
Standing Protective Order. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 3/12/2025. (Mendez, D)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Electronic Filing Order Mon 03/17 12:05 PM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 3/12/2025. (Mendez, D)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Pretrial Deadlines Mon 03/17 12:04 PM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/12/2025. Discovery due by 9/11/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 10/16/2025. Signed by Clerk on 3/12/2025. (Mendez, D)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/12 4:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Holly M. Polglase on behalf of Makita USA, Inc (Polglase, Holly)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Affidavit Wed 03/12 4:19 PM
AFFIDAVIT Rule 7.1 Diversity Disclosure Statement Signed By Holly Polglase filed by Makita USA, Inc. (Polglase, Holly)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Affidavit Wed 03/12 4:14 PM
AFFIDAVIT Statement Pursuant to Standing Order on Removed Cases Signed By Holly Polglase filed by Makita USA, Inc. (Polglase, Holly)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Wed 03/12 4:07 PM
NOTICE by Makita USA, Inc of No Pending Motions (Polglase, Holly)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Wed 03/12 4:03 PM
NOTICE by Makita USA, Inc Certificate of Filing and Service of Notice of Removal (Polglase, Holly)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Wed 03/12 3:57 PM
NOTICE by Makita USA, Inc Corporate Disclosure Statement (Polglase, Holly)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Wed 03/12 3:48 PM
NOTICE by Makita USA, Inc Civil Action Cover Sheet (Polglase, Holly)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs cmp Notice of Removal Wed 03/12 3:28 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Makita USA Inc from Superior Court, Bridgeport Judicial District, Connecticut, case number FBT-CV-6144079-S. Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACTDC-8095054, filed by Makita USA Inc.(Polglase, Holly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Summons & Complaint
utility NEW Case Assignment Thu 03/13 11:13 AM
CASE ASSIGNMENT: District Judge Robert N. Chatigny assigned to the case. If the District Judge issues an Order of Referral to a Magistrate Judge for any matter other than settlement, the matter will be referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas O. Farrish. (Freberg, B)
Related: [-]