Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Robin L Rosenberg
Referred: Panayotta D Augustin-Bir
Case #: 0:25-cv-60478
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1443cv Notice of Removal - Civil Rights Cases
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2025
Case in other court:Seventeenth Judicial Circuit, 25-001695
Last checked: Saturday Apr 26, 2025 7:35 AM EDT
Defendant
Richard Le Pailleur
Represented By
Nicole Marie Vescova
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smiith
contact info
Jonathan Alan Beckerman
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP
contact info
Shannon Elizabeth Murphy
contact info
Defendant
The Wave Condominium Association
Represented By
Nicole Marie Vescova
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smiith
contact info
Jonathan Alan Beckerman
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP
contact info
Shannon Elizabeth Murphy
contact info
Defendant
Elliot Eisinrod
Defendant
FirstService Residential, Inc.
Represented By
Nicole Marie Vescova
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smiith
contact info
Jonathan Alan Beckerman
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP
contact info
Shannon Elizabeth Murphy
contact info
Defendant
Arnold Jean-Baptiste
Defendant
Marksman Security Corporation
Defendant
Paolo Sbarra
Mediator
Karen Putney-Evans
Plaintiff
Ronell S. Kirkley
3301 NE 5th Ave, Apt. 1104
Miami, FL 33137


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
68 68 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Tue 05/13 3:33 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting Defendant Marksman Security Corporation's67 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's31 Amended Complaint no later than June 2, 2025. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (kzu)
Related: [-]
67 67 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Tue 05/13 12:23 PM
Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to31 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, by Marksman Security Corporation. (Aroca, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
66 66 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 05/09 10:48 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Victoria N. Pineda on behalf of Marksman Security Corporation. Attorney Victoria N. Pineda added to party Marksman Security Corporation(pty:dft). (Pineda, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
65 65 motion Dismiss Wed 05/07 2:30 PM
MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice31 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, by Paolo Sbarra, Elliot Eisinrod, FirstService Residential, Inc., Richard Le Pailleur, The Wave Condominium Association. Attorney Nicole Marie Vescova added to party Paolo Sbarra(pty:dft), Attorney Nicole Marie Vescova added to party Elliot Eisinrod(pty:dft). Responses due by 5/21/2025. (Vescova, Nicole)
Related: [-]
64 64 order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Wed 05/07 1:43 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER denying Plaintiff's61 Motion for Reconsideration. The Court is aware of the filings on the docket and exercised its considerable case management discretion in granting Defendants'39 Motion for Extension of Time. See also Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b), 55(c). Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (kzu)
Related: [-]
63 63 order Clerk's Entry/Non-Entry of Default - FORM Wed 05/07 11:09 AM
Clerk's Non-Entry of Default as to FirstService Residential, Inc., Richard Le Pailleur, The Wave Condominium Association - Motions Terminated:62 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default. Reason: Answer deadline has NOT lapsed Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 5/7/2025. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's31 Amended Complaint no later than May 9, 2025, per DE# 59 . (gqa)
Related: [-]
62 62 motion CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT Wed 05/07 11:03 AM
MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default as to FirstService Residential, Inc., Richard Le Pailleur, The Wave Condominium Association by Ronell S. Kirkley. (gqa)
Related: [-]
61 61 motion Reconsideration Wed 05/07 10:34 AM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Reconsideration of the Order Granting DE 59 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time. by Ronell S. Kirkley. (gqa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
60 60 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 05/06 4:11 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rebecca Valentina Aroca on behalf of Marksman Security Corporation. Attorney Rebecca Valentina Aroca added to party Marksman Security Corporation(pty:dft). (Aroca, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
59 59 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 05/06 12:30 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting the39 Motion for Extension of Time by Defendants The Wave Condominium Association, Inc., Richard Le Pailleur, and FirstService Residential Florida, Inc. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's31 Amended Complaint no later than May 9, 2025. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (kzu)
Related: [-]
58 58 notice Notice (Other) Tue 05/06 11:40 AM
NOTICE of Filing in connection with the record by Ronell S. Kirkley (gqa)
Related: [-]
47 47 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 05/06 9:58 AM
ORDER denying without prejudice41 Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw Deemed Admissions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch on 5/6/2025. See attached document for full details. (sk01)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline Tue 05/06 1:01 PM
Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline: FirstService Residential, Inc. response/answer due 5/9/2025; Richard Le Pailleur response/answer due 5/9/2025; The Wave Condominium Association response/answer due 5/9/2025. PER DE#59 (cds)
Related: [-]