Mississippi Southern District Court
Judge:Louis Guirola, Jr
Referred: Bradley W Rath
Case #: 1:25-cv-00067
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 26, 2025 4:28 AM CDT
Defendant
Bill Dietz, Sr.
Defendant
John and Jane Does A-G
Defendant
Russ Schreiner
Defendant
Global Connections to Employment (GCE), Inc.
Plaintiff
W. Fred Hornsby, II
Represented By
W. F. Hornsby, III
Hornsby Watts, PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Global Connections for Employment (GCE) Lakeview Center, Inc.
Terminated: 04/01/2025


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, April 25, 2025
6 6 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Fri 04/25 3:46 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by W. Fred Hornsby, II as to Global Connections to Employment (GCE), Inc.. (Hornsby, W.)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 04/25 11:30 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by W. Fred Hornsby, II. Global Connections to Employment (GCE), Inc. waiver sent on 4/24/2025, answer due 6/23/2025. (Hornsby, W.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 04/03 12:59 PM
Summons Issued as to Bill Dietz, Sr, Global Connections to Employment (GCE), Inc., Russ Schreiner. (JCH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 04/01 10:01 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by W. Fred Hornsby, II.(Hornsby, W.)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Tue 04/01 9:08 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #2: The Amended Complaint was filed incorrect and will be disregarded. Per the Amended Complaint, Global Connections for Employment (GCE) Lakeview Center, Inc. is no longer a defendant and should not have been selected. Global Connections to Employment (GCE), Inc. should have been added by the filer. Attorney is advised to re-file. Once the Amended Complaint has been re-filed, court staff will terminate Global Connections for Employment (GCE) Lakeview Center, Inc. as a defendant. (RLW)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Tue 04/01 10:25 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #3: Advising attorney that All Defendants should not have been selected. Each defendant's name should have been highlighted/selected when the filer was asked to select the parties that the Amended Complaint was against. Attorney is not required to re-file. (RLW)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
2 2 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 03/31 4:15 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bill Dietz, Sr, Global Connections for Employment (GCE) Lakeview Center, Inc., John and Jane Does A-G, Russ Schreiner, filed by W. Fred Hornsby, II.(Hornsby, W.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/12 1:08 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Bill Dietz, Sr, Global Connections for Employment (GCE) Lakeview Center, Inc., John and Jane Does A-G, Russ Schreiner ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number 2794), filed by W. Fred Hornsby, II.(wld)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet