Missouri Western District Court
Judge:Brian C Wimes
Case #: 3:25-cv-05015
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 26, 2025 6:49 AM CDT
Defendant
Daniel Erwin
Represented By
Bethany G. Parsons
Turner, Reid, Duncan, Loomer & Patton, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Emily A. Taylor
Represented By
David E Larson
Martin, Pringle
contact info
Defendant
Buchanan, Williams & O'Brien, PC
Represented By
David E Larson
Martin, Pringle
contact info
Plaintiff
Sherif Ahmed Aboul-Magd
138 Park Central Square, #312
Springfield, MO 65806
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Judge Luke Boyer
Terminated: 03/17/2025
Defendant
Theresa Kenney
Terminated: 03/17/2025
Defendant
The Buchanan Law Firm, LLC
Terminated: 04/01/2025
Defendant
Jasper County, Missouri
Terminated: 03/17/2025


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, May 15, 2025
28 28 notice Notice of Filing Thu 05/15 4:29 PM
PRO SE NOTICE of filing by Sherif Ahmed Aboul-Magd re21 Notice of filing,,17 MOTION for temporary restraining order.(KSS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index Exhibit Index,
Att: 2 Exhibit K-24,
Att: 3 Exhibit K-25,
Att: 4 Exhibit K-27,
Att: 5 Exhibit K-28,
Att: 6 Certificate of Service
27 27 respm Suggestions in Opposition to Motion Thu 05/15 2:43 PM
SUGGESTIONS in opposition re22 MOTION to expedite,17 MOTION for temporary restraining order,23 MOTION to stay filed by David E Larson on behalf of Defendants Buchanan, Williams & O'Brien, PC, Emily A. Taylor. Reply suggestions due by 5/29/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. Related [+] (Larson, David)
Related: [-] 22 ,17 ,23
Monday, May 12, 2025
26 26 notice Notice of Filing Mon 05/12 4:31 PM
Pro Se NOTICE of Escalated Risk of Retaliatory Harm by Sherif Ahmed Aboul-Magd. NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (RLF)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice of Filing Mon 05/12 4:30 PM
Pro Se NOTICE of Readiness for Ruling on Pending Motions by Sherif Ahmed Aboul-Magd. NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (RLF)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice of Filing Mon 05/12 4:28 PM
Pro Se NOTICE of Consolidated TRO Record and Final Supplement by Sherif Ahmed Aboul-Magd. NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (RLF)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Stay Mon 05/12 4:27 PM
Pro Se MOTION to Stay June 2, 2025 Criminal Hearing and Request for Protective Relief filed by Sherif Ahmed Aboul-Magd. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/27/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. NEF mailed to Plaintiff.(RLF)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Expedite Mon 05/12 4:25 PM
Pro Se MOTION to Expedite Ruling on Emergency TRO or Set Rule 65 Hearing filed by Sherif Ahmed Aboul-Magd. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/27/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. NEF mailed to Plaintiff.(RLF)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of Filing Mon 05/12 4:23 PM
Pro Se NOTICE of filing by Sherif Ahmed Aboul-Magd re17 MOTION for temporary restraining order NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (RLF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Index,
Att: 2 Exhibit K-8,
Att: 3 Exhibit K-14b,
Att: 4 Exhibit K-14c,
Att: 5 Exhibit K-22,
Att: 6 Exhibit K-15,
Att: 7 Exhibit K-15b,
Att: 8 Exhibit K-15c,
Att: 9 Exhibit K-15d,
Att: 10 Exhibit K-15e,
Att: 11 Exhibit K-15f,
Att: 12 Exhibit K-15g,
Att: 13 Exhibit K-15h,
Att: 14 Exhibit K-15i,
Att: 15 Exhibit K-17a,
Att: 16 Exhibit K-18,
Att: 17 Exhibit K-20,
Att: 18 Exhibit K-23,
Att: 19 Exhibit K-17
Friday, May 09, 2025
20 20 respm Reply Suggestions to Motion Fri 05/09 4:40 PM
REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Bethany G. Parsons on behalf of Defendant Daniel Erwin. Related [+] (Parsons, Bethany)
Related: [-] 11
19 19 respm Suggestions in Support of Motion Fri 05/09 2:14 PM
SUGGESTIONS in support re7 MOTION for more definite statement filed by David E Larson on behalf of Defendants Buchanan, Williams & O'Brien, PC, Emily A. Taylor. Related [+] (Larson, David)
Related: [-] 7
18 18 notice Notice of Filing Fri 05/09 1:31 PM
PRO SE SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE of filing by Sherif Ahmed Aboul-Magd re17 MOTION for temporary restraining order. (JSH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits
Thursday, May 08, 2025
17 17 motion Temporary Restraining Order Thu 05/08 3:05 PM
PRO SE MOTION for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction filed by Sherif Ahmed Aboul-Magd. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/22/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hanna, Jaime)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits,
Att: 2 Declaration
16 16 notice Notice of Filing Thu 05/08 2:57 PM
PRO SE NOTICE of filing of video evidence under seal by Sherif Ahmed Aboul-Magd. (Hanna, Jaime)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Filing Thu 05/08 2:55 PM
PRO SE NOTICE of filing - Emergency Notice to Court by Sherif Ahmed Aboul-Magd. (Hanna, Jaime)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
14 14 respm Suggestions in Opposition to Motion Fri 04/25 11:43 AM
PRO SE SUGGESTIONS in opposition re11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT on behalf of Plaintiff Sherif Ahmed Aboul-Magd. Reply suggestions due by 5/9/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. Related [+] (Hanna, Jaime)
Related: [-] 11
Att: 1 Exhibit A
13 13 respm Suggestions in Opposition to Motion Fri 04/25 11:41 AM
PRO SE SUGGESTIONS in opposition re7 MOTION for more definite statement on behalf of Plaintiff Sherif Ahmed Aboul-Magd. Reply suggestions due by 5/9/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. Related [+] (Hanna, Jaime)
Related: [-] 7
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
12 12 respm Suggestions in Support of Motion Wed 04/23 4:43 PM
SUGGESTIONS in support re11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Bethany G. Parsons on behalf of Defendant Daniel Erwin. Related [+] (Parsons, Bethany)
Related: [-] 11
11 11 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 04/23 3:29 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Bethany G. Parsons on behalf of Daniel Erwin. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/7/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Parsons, Bethany)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/23 3:24 PM
NOTICE of appearance by Bethany G. Parsons on behalf of Daniel Erwin (Attorney Bethany G. Parsons added to party Daniel Erwin(pty:dft))(Parsons, Bethany)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
9 9 order Rule 16 Notice Tue 04/22 2:13 PM
RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 5/27/2025. Scheduling Conference set for 6/10/2025 02:30 PM in Telephone Conference - Kansas City before District Judge Brian C Wimes. Signed on 4/22/25 by District Judge Brian C Wimes. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
Related: [-]
8 8 respm Suggestions in Support of Motion Tue 04/22 1:38 PM
SUGGESTIONS in support re7 MOTION for more definite statement filed by David E Larson on behalf of Defendants Buchanan, Williams & O'Brien, PC, Emily A. Taylor. Related [+] (Larson, David)
Related: [-] 7
7 7 motion More Definite Statement Tue 04/22 1:37 PM
MOTION for more definite statement filed by David E Larson on behalf of Buchanan, Williams & O'Brien, PC, Emily A. Taylor. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/6/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Larson, David)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/22 1:32 PM
NOTICE of appearance by David E Larson on behalf of Emily A. Taylor (Attorney David E Larson added to party Emily A. Taylor (pty:dft))(Larson, David)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/22 12:57 PM
NOTICE of appearance by David E Larson on behalf of Buchanan, Williams & O'Brien, PC (Attorney David E Larson added to party Buchanan, Williams & O'Brien, PC(pty:dft))(Larson, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
4 4 service Return of Service of Complaint Executed Tue 04/08 3:22 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Sherif Ahmed Aboul-Magd. Buchanan, Williams & O'Brien, PC served on 4/2/2025, answer due 4/23/2025; Daniel Erwin served on 4/2/2025, answer due 4/23/2025; Emily A. Taylor served on 4/2/2025, answer due 4/23/2025. (Hanna, Jaime)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Emily Taylor,
Att: 2 Buchanan, Williams & O'Brien,
Att: 3 Daniel Erwin
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 04/01 2:34 PM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Daniel Erwin, Emily A. Taylor, Buchanan, Williams & O'Brien, PC filed by Sherif Ahmed Aboul-Magd. (Hanna, Jaime)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
service Summons Issued Tue 03/18 10:09 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Daniel Erwin, Emily A. Taylor, The Buchanan Law Firm, LLC. (Hanna, Jaime)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
2 2 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 03/17 4:37 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Daniel Erwin, Emily A. Taylor, The Buchanan Law Firm, LLC filed by Sherif Ahmed Aboul-Magd.(Siegert, Karen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit List,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F,
Att: 8 Exhibit G,
Att: 9 Exhibit H,
Att: 10 Exhibit J
Friday, March 14, 2025
misc Receipt Fri 03/14 12:52 PM
RECEIPT number 400007514 in the amount of $405.00 issued to Sherif Aboul-Magd. Check # 22-092048972. (Grassano, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/12 3:45 PM
Pro Se COMPLAINT against Luke Boyer, Daniel Erwin, Jasper County, Missouri, Theresa Kenney, Emily A. Taylor, The Buchanan Law Firm, LLC Sherif Ahmed Aboul-Magd. Service due by 6/9/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Furtak, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit I,
Att: 9 Exhibit J,
Att: 10 Civil Cover Sheet