Utah District Court
Judge:David Barlow
Case #: 2:25-cv-00192
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2025
Terminated:May 12, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 26, 2025 5:56 AM MDT
Defendant
Academy Mortgage Corporation
Plaintiff
Charly Bates
Represented By
Jason R. Hull
Marshall Olson & Hull PC
contact info
Anikka Hoidal
Marshall Olson & Hull PC
contact info
Nickolas J. Hagman
Cafferty Clobes Meriwether & Sprengel LLP
contact info

GPO May 12 2025
., No. 2:25-cv-00192. The clerk of court shall administratively close this case. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 5/12/25. (jrj) MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING 66 PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED ACTIONS AND DENYING 68 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AS MOOT - No further filings shall be made in Bates v. Academy Mortg. Corp

Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
13 13 notice No Docketing Notice - Member Case Consolidation Mon 05/12 10:00 AM
THIS CASE HAS BEEN CLOSED pursuant to order of consolidation. All docketing will be in the lead case 2:24cv00015 Case Reassigned to Judge David Barlow. Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett no longer assigned to the case. NO FURTHER DOCKETING ON THIS CASE. (jrj)
Related: [-]
12 12 8 pgs order Memorandum Decision Order Mon 05/12 9:53 AM
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING 66 PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED ACTIONS AND DENYING 68 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AS MOOT - No further filings shall be made in Bates v. Academy Mortg. Corp., No. 2:25-cv-00192. The clerk of court shall administratively close this case. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 5/12/25. (jrj)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
11 11 misc Notice of Filing Mon 04/07 11:54 AM
NOTICE OF FILING filed by Defendant Academy Mortgage Corporation.(Brown, Kamie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Opposition Memorandum
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Tue 03/25 3:09 PM
NOTICE of Filing of Motion to Consolidate by Charly Bates (Hoidal, Anikka)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Motion to Consolidate
Monday, March 24, 2025
9 9 notice Notice PHV Requirements Mon 03/24 11:06 AM
NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance Pro Hac Vice e-mailed to attorney Justin J. Boron for Academy Mortgage Corporation. (alf)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice PHV Requirements Mon 03/24 9:20 AM
NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance Pro Hac Vice emailed to attorney Justin J. Boron for Academy Mortgage Corporation. (mh)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 03/21 2:57 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Charly Bates. Waiver received from Academy Mortgage Corporation on March 21, 2025.(Hoidal, Anikka)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Summons
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/19 3:14 PM
ORDER granting 5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Nickolas J. Hagman for Charly Bates. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.A Pro Hac Vice Attorney who fails to register for CM/ECF access will not receive notifications of electronic filings. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 3/19/2025. (haa)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry) Wed 03/19 11:19 AM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nickolas J. Hagman , Registration fee $ 50, receipt number AUTDC-5366626, Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at[LINK:https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html] . Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at[LINK:https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing] . filed by Plaintiff Charly Bates.(Hoidal, Anikka)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit Application for PHV (N. Hagman)
Thursday, March 13, 2025
4 4 5 pgs order Order to Propose Schedule Thu 03/13 8:16 AM
ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 3/12/2025. (kec)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Electronically Wed 03/12 2:53 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Academy Mortgage Corporation. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice PHV Requirements Wed 03/12 2:33 PM
NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance Pro Hac Vice emailed to attorney Nickolas Hagman, Alexander Sweatman and Krishna Motta for Charly Bates (kec)
Related: [-]
1 1 73 pgs cmp Complaint (Atty) Wed 03/12 2:23 PM
COMPLAINT against Academy Mortgage Corporation (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AUTDC-5360459) filed by Charly Bates. (Hoidal, Anikka)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 03/12 2:35 PM
Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett added. Case number will now read 2:25-cv-00192-JCB. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (kec)
Related: [-]