Virginia Eastern District Court
Case #: 4:25-cr-00017
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Mar 13, 2025 3:21 AM EDT
Defendant
Alexander Riley Havens (1)
Represented By
Suzanne Victoria Katchmar
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Devon Elise Alston Heath
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/13/2025 4:17 AM EDT
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
1 1 MOTION to Seal Criminal Complaint by USA as to Alexander Riley Havens. (awoo) [4:25-mj-00019]
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER granting1 Motion to Seal Criminal Complaint as to Alexander Riley Havens (1). It is ORDERED that the complaint and affidavit in support of the complaint, Motion to Seal, and this Order be Sealed until the defendant is arrested. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 3/5/2025. (awoo) [4:25-mj-00019]
Related: [-]
3 3 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Alexander Riley Havens (1). (awoo) [4:25-mj-00019]
Related: [-]
4 4 AFFIDAVIT in Support of3 Criminal Complaint by USA as to Alexander Riley Havens (awoo) [4:25-mj-00019]
Related: [-]
5 5 Arrest Warrant Issued and delivered to USM in case as to Alexander Riley Havens. (awoo) [4:25-mj-00019]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
Set Hearings as to Alexander Riley Havens: Initial Appearance set for 3/6/2025 at 02:30 PM in Norfolk Mag Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (btit) [4:25-mj-00019]
Related: [-]
Case unsealed as to Alexander Riley Havens (mrees) [4:25-mj-00019]
Related: [-]
7 7 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 3/6/25 in case as to Alexander Riley Havens. (mrees) [4:25-mj-00019]
Related: [-]
8 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask: Initial Appearance as to Alexander Riley Havens held. (Court Reporter FTR - Mag 2.) Deft present in custody. Govt appeared through Luke Bresnahan, AUSA. Counsel desired. Rodolfo Cejas, AFPD present. Court directed appointment of counsel. FPD appointed in open court. Govt motion for detention. Temporary Detention ordered. Preliminary and Detention Hearing set for 3/11/2025 at 02:30 PM in Norfolk Mag Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. Deft remanded to USM custody. (alet) [4:25-mj-00019]
Related: [-]
9 9 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Alexander Riley Havens. (alet) [4:25-mj-00019]
Related: [-]
10 10 Temporary Detention Order as to Alexander Riley Havens. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 3/6/2025. (alet) [4:25-mj-00019]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER - This matter comes before the Court on its own initiative. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 5(f) and the Due Process Protections Act, Pub. L. No 116-182, 134 Stat. 894 (Oct. 21, 2020), the Court ORDERS the United States to adhere to the disclosure obligations set forth in Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Brady v. Maryland instructs that the suppression by the prosecution of evidence favorable to an accused violates due process where the evidence is material either to guilt or to punishment, irrespective of the good faith or bad faith of the prosecution. 373 U.S. at 87. Failure to adhere to this requirement may result in serious consequences, up to and including vacating a conviction or disciplinary action against the prosecution. Having given counsel the oral admonition required by the Due Process Protections Act, this Order serves as the reminder of prosecutorial obligation and duties in accordance with Rule 5(f) and the Eastern District of Virginia Standing Order concerning the same as to Alexander Riley Havens. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 3/6/2025. (alet) [4:25-mj-00019]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
13 13 INDICTMENT returned and filed in open court as to Alexander Riley Havens (1) count(s) 1. On motion of the Government, arraignment to be scheduled for March 11, 2025 at 2:30 p.m. (jhie, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Criminal Cover Sheet