Arizona District Court
Case #: 2:25-cr-00374
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Mar 13, 2025 12:17 AM MST
Defendant
Maximilian Weitershausen (1)
Represented By
Kaitlin Sofia Verdura
Verdura Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Regan L Pauls
Us Attorneys Office - Phoenix, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/13/2025 1:10 AM MST
Friday, February 21, 2025
Arrest of Maximilian Weitershausen on 2/21/2025. (MRH) [2:25-mj-05111-DMF]
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 22, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Maximilian Weitershausen. (MRH) [2:25-mj-05111-DMF]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
2 2 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: Regan Pauls appearing for USA. Attorney Megan Kelly terminated . (Pauls, Regan) [2:25-mj-05111-DMF]
Related: [-]
4 4 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle: Initial Appearance as to Maximilian Weitershausen held on 2/24/2025. DEFENDANT SWORN AS TO FINANCIAL STATUS. Appointing Kaitlin Sofia Verdura for Defendant. Government is seeking detention. For reasons stated on the record, the Defendant shall be placed at the end of the calendar to discuss the detention and preliminary hearings. Detention Hearing submitted. Defendant ordered released on own recognizance with conditions. Conditions of Release reviewed on the record with the Defendant. Preliminary Hearing waived. Finding: Defendant held to answer before District Court. As required by Rule 5(f), the United States is ordered to produce all information required by Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, and contempt proceedings. Appearances : AUSA Abbie Broughton and Megan Kelly for the Government, CJA Attorney Kaitlin Verdura for Defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Related [+] Hearing held 2:56 PM - 3:01 PM and 3:50 PM - 4:04 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (AO) [2:25-mj-05111-DMF]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART
5 5 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, the United States is ordered to disclose in a timely manner all exculpatory evidence to the defendant(s), that is, all evidence that is favorable to the defendant(s) or tends to cast doubt on the United States' case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Failure to comply with this order may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, the reversal of any conviction, the exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, and/or sanctions by the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle.(AO)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) [2:25-mj-05111-DMF]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
6 6 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Maximilian Weitershausen. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 2/24/2025. (AO) [2:25-mj-05111-DMF]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
7 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: Regan Pauls appearing for USA . (Pauls, Regan) [2:25-mj-05111-DMF]
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE OF ERRATA by USA as to Maximilian Weitershausen.. (Pauls, Regan) [2:25-mj-05111-DMF]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
9 9 INFORMATION - Felony as to Maximilian Weitershausen (1) count(s) 1. (KGM)
Related: [-]
10 10 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Maximilian Weitershausen. (KGM)
Related: [-]
11 11 DOJ CONFLICT MEMO. No probable conflict re Judge Krissa M. Lanham. Filed by USA as to Maximilian Weitershausen. (KGM)
Related: [-]
12 12 CONSENT OF DEFENDANT Maximilian Weitershausen for Guilty Plea Hearing before a United States Magistrate Judge. (KGM)
Related: [-]
13 13 MINUTE ORDER as to Maximilian Weitershausen: This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge John Z. Boyle to conduct a plea hearing. (KGM)
Related: [-]