Montana District Court
Case #: 2:25-mj-00016
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Mar 13, 2025 1:18 AM MDT
Defendant
Bhaveshkumar Dahyabhai Shukla (1)
Plaintiff
USA


Docket last updated: 03/13/2025 2:30 AM MDT
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
1 1 Duplicate Original COMPLAINT as to Bhaveshkumar Dahyabhai Shukla (1). (APP) (APP).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Att: 2 (3/12/2025) Agent signed complaint,
Att: 3 (3/12/2025) Agent signed affidavit