Indiana Northern District Court
Case #: 2:25-mj-00022
Case Filed:Feb 11, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Mar 13, 2025 4:00 AM EDT
Defendant
Israel Castro (1)
Represented By
Roxanne Mendez Johnson - FCD
Federal Community Defenders Inc - Ham/in
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Kristian Mukoski - AUSA
Us District Court - Ham/in
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/13/2025 5:18 AM EDT
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
1 1 UNSEALED COMPLAINT as to Israel Castro (1). (shk) Modified on 2/14/2025 to show unsealed (smb).
Related: [-]