Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Elizabeth W Hanes
Referred: Robert J Krask
Case #: 2:25-cv-00146
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause15:1640 Truth in Lending
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 27, 2025 6:30 AM EDT
Defendant
Linear Title and Escrow, LLC
Defendant
PennyMac Loan Services, LLC
Represented By
Namrata Loomba
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Defendant
Hometown Equity Mortgage, LLC
Plaintiff
Leroy McCant Jr.
Represented By
Ryan Brandon Graves
Tavss Fletcher Maiden & Reed PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
13 13 1 pgs order Order Wed 04/30 3:02 PM
ORDER. It is SO ORDERED, the Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file an agreed dismissal order, or Defendants Hometown Equity Mortgage, LLC and Linear Title and Escrow, LLC are DIRECTED to file responsive pleadings within forty-five days of the date of this Order. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes on 4/30/2025. (Vpea)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
12 12 misc Status Report Fri 04/25 4:18 PM
STATUS REPORT by Leroy McCant Jr.. (Graves, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
notice Notice (other) Tue 04/15 4:55 PM
NOTICE. CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Responsive pleadings to the complaint have not been filed by Hometown Equity Mortgage, LLC and Linear Title and Escrow, LLC. Counsel is requested to file a status report within fifteen (15) days from the date of this notice. The status report should be in the form of a pleading that conforms to ECF Policies and Procedures (Vpea)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
11 11 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 04/10 7:08 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. (Loomba, Namrata)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 04/10 7:06 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC.(Loomba, Namrata)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/10 7:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Namrata Loomba on behalf of PennyMac Loan Services, LLC (Loomba, Namrata)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 03/27 12:24 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leroy McCant Jr. Linear Title and Escrow, LLC served on 3/19/2025, answer due 4/9/2025 (Graves, Ryan)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 03/27 12:23 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leroy McCant Jr. PennyMac Loan Services, LLC served on 3/21/2025, answer due 4/11/2025 (Graves, Ryan)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 03/27 12:21 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leroy McCant Jr. Hometown Equity Mortgage, LLC served on 3/21/2025, answer due 4/11/2025 (Graves, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 03/17 10:18 AM
Three (3) Summonses Issued as to Hometown Equity Mortgage, LLC, Linear Title and Escrow, LLC, PennyMac Loan Services, LLC, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted.(epri, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Motions Procedures
Friday, March 14, 2025
utility Initial Case Assignment Mon 03/17 10:16 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (epri, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
4 4 misc Proposed Summons Thu 03/13 11:15 AM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint, by Leroy McCant Jr. (Graves, Ryan)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons Thu 03/13 11:14 AM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint, by Leroy McCant Jr. (Graves, Ryan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Thu 03/13 11:13 AM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint, by Leroy McCant Jr. (Graves, Ryan)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 03/13 11:09 AM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-10059810.), filed by Leroy McCant Jr..(Graves, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Note,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Deed of Trust,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Notice of Right to Cancel,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit D - Rescission Email,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit E - Assignment