Oklahoma Northern District Court
Judge:Christine D Little
Case #: 4:25-cv-00119
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2025
Case in other court:Tulsa Cty District Ct, CJ-25-00243
Last checked: Sunday Apr 27, 2025 4:45 AM CDT
Counter Claimant
New England Desperado, LLP
Represented By
Destyn D. Stanton
Solomon Arieh
contact info
David Royce Keesling
Solomon Arieh
contact info
Counter Claimant
Rodney Rollins
Represented By
Destyn D. Stanton
Solomon Arieh
contact info
Counter Defendant
Paul Logistics, Inc.
Represented By
Matthew C Goodin
The Goodin Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
New England Desperado, LLP
Represented By
Destyn D. Stanton
Solomon Arieh
contact info
David Royce Keesling
Solomon Arieh
contact info
Plaintiff
Paul Logistics, Inc.
Represented By
Matthew C Goodin
The Goodin Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
24 24 notice Notice (Other) Fri 05/16 12:34 PM
NOTICE Regarding Adverse Determination regarding Doc. 18 Related [+] by Paul Logistics, Inc. (With attachments) (Goodin, Matthew)
Related: [-] 18 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
23 23 order 02 - Minute Order Documents - Link to Document(s) Tue 05/06 2:26 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Christine D Little The Motion to Withdraw (Doc. 20) is conditionally granted, subject to the following conditions. As to Defendant New England Desperado LLP, the withdrawal of attorneys David R. Keesling and Destyn D. Stanton shall be effective upon the entry of appearance of substitute counsel. New England Desperado LLP is hereby directed to cause new counsel to enter an appearance in this matter. As to Counterclaimant Rollins, the withdrawal of attorneys David R. Keesling and Destyn D. Stanton shall be effective upon the entry of appearance of substitute counsel or upon Mr. Rollins filing a statement that he wishes to proceed pro se in this matter. Mr. Rollins is directed to cause new counsel to enter an appearance in this matter or to file a statement as described herein. Related [+] (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (CDL1, Chambers)
Related: [-] 20 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Attorney(s) David R. Keesling and Destyn D. Stanton
22 22 order 02 - Minute Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Ruling on Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion Tue 05/06 2:19 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Christine D Little Defendant New England Desperado, LLP and Counterclaimant Rodney Rollins may respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss or Strike (Doc. 18) by May 29, 2025. Any reply shall be due June 12, 2025. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 5/29/2025, Replies due by 6/12/2025); granting21 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion Related [+] (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (CDL1, Chambers)
Related: [-] 18 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim
Monday, May 05, 2025
21 21 2 pgs motion Extension of Time to Respond to Motion Mon 05/05 11:13 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss or Strike Certain Counterclaims of Defendant New England Desperado, LLP, and Claims Asserted by Rodney Rollins, with Brief in Support Related [+] by New England Desperado, LLP, Rodney Rollins (Stanton, Destyn)
Related: [-] 18 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim
20 20 2 pgs motion Withdraw Attorney(s) Mon 05/05 10:10 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Attorney(s) David R. Keesling and Destyn D. Stanton by New England Desperado, LLP, Rodney Rollins (Stanton, Destyn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
19 19 respoth Answer Thu 04/24 7:49 PM
ANSWER Related [+] by Paul Logistics, Inc. (Goodin, Matthew)
Related: [-] 14 Counterclaim,
18 18 8 pgs motion Dismiss Thu 04/24 7:46 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim by Paul Logistics, Inc. [Note: Attorney Matthew C Goodin added to party Paul Logistics, Inc.(pty:pla).] (With attachments) (Goodin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
17 17 order 05 - Scheduling Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Scheduling Order Date(s) Wed 04/09 11:17 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Christine D Little , setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 10/6/2025, Dispositive Motions due by 11/17/2025, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/23/2026, Pretrial Conference set for 3/23/2026 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Christine D Little, Jury Trial set for 4/6/2026 at 09:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Christine D Little) (tjc, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
16 16 order 02 - Minute Order Directing - Party(ies) to File Disclosure Statement Tue 04/08 9:46 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Rodney Rollins to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (mm, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
misc Notice of Docket Entry Modification Mon 04/07 9:35 AM
NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: Wrong against party was selected; Correction: Changed the against party Related [+] (dla, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 14 Counterclaim,
Friday, April 04, 2025
15 15 misc Joint Status Report per LCvR16-1(b)(1) Fri 04/04 7:24 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Paul Logistics, Inc. (Goodin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
14 14 cmp Counterclaim Fri 04/04 1:00 PM
COUNTERCLAIM with Jury Demand against New England Desperado, LLP, Rodney Rollins by New England Desperado, LLP, Rodney Rollins [Note: Attorney Destyn D. Stanton added to party Rodney Rollins(pty:cc).] (Stanton, Destyn)
Related: [-]
13 13 order 02 - Minute Order Directing - Party to Re-File Document(s) Fri 04/04 10:56 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , Having reviewed the docket entry and/or PDF for Dkt # 12 , the Court has determined that this is a multi-event document . Attorney Destyn D. Stanton is hereby directed to re-file the counterclaim with the correct event forthwith. Related [+] (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dla, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 12 Answer
misc Notice of Docket Entry Modification Fri 04/04 10:57 AM
NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: This is a multi-event document, which is not allowed in CM/ECF; Correction: counsel directed to file second event as a separate entry Related [+] (dla, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 12 Answer
Thursday, April 03, 2025
12 12 respoth Answer Thu 04/03 7:30 PM
ANSWER with Jury Demand Related [+] by New England Desperado, LLP (Stanton, Destyn)
Related: [-] State Court Petition/Complaint
Friday, March 21, 2025
11 11 order 02 - Minute Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Ruling on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 03/21 10:26 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Christine D Little For good cause shown, Defendant's Motion (Doc. 10) is granted. Defendant may file a responsive pleading on or before April 3, 2025. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 4/3/2025); granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (CDL1, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
10 10 motion Extension of Time to Answer Thu 03/20 8:40 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Related [+] by New England Desperado, LLP (Stanton, Destyn)
Related: [-] State Court Petition/Complaint
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
9 9 notice Appearance - Attorney Wed 03/19 3:45 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by David Royce Keesling on behalf of New England Desperado, LLP [Note: Attorney David Royce Keesling added to party New England Desperado, LLP(pty:dft).] (Keesling, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
8 8 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Fri 03/14 4:14 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by New England Desperado, LLP (Stanton, Destyn)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Fri 03/14 1:52 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Paul Holding, LLC for Paul Logistics, Inc.) by Paul Logistics, Inc. (Goodin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
6 6 order 01 - Order Directing - Parties to File Joint Status Report Fri 03/14 1:48 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Christine D Little , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 4/4/2025) (tjc, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Appearance - Attorney Fri 03/14 1:45 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Matthew C Goodin on behalf of Paul Logistics, Inc. [Note: Attorney Matthew C Goodin added to party Paul Logistics, Inc.(pty:pla).] (Goodin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
4 4 order 02 - Minute Order Directing - Party(ies) to File Disclosure Statement Thu 03/13 2:24 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Paul Logistics, Inc. and New England Desperado, LLP to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (cjb, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
3 3 order 15 - Notice of Assignment of Case to MJ Thu 03/13 2:23 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. ACTION REQUIRED: This case has been randomly assigned to a United States magistrate judge for all purposes, including trial, final entry of judgment, and direct review by the Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge, if the attached form is not signed and returned within the applicable deadline. The plaintiff or removing party must serve a copy of this notice upon all other parties to this action. (cjb, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Removal Thu 03/13 2:01 PM
NOTICE of Removal from Tulsa County District Court, case number CJ-2025-243 (paid $405 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-3174134) by New England Desperado, LLP (With attachments) (Stanton, Destyn)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 03/13 1:56 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by New England Desperado, LLP (Stanton, Destyn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
cmp State Court Petition/Complaint Thu 03/13 9:50 AM
PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against New England Desperado, LLP by Paul Logistics, Inc. (cjb, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]