Oklahoma Western District Court
Judge:Charles Goodwin
Case #: 5:25-cv-00315
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2025
Case in other court:Custer County District Court, CJ-25-00008
Last checked: Sunday Apr 27, 2025 4:09 AM CDT
Defendant
Mark Young Construction LLC
Represented By
Tiffany D Barker
Pierce Couch Hendrickson Baysinger & Green, L.L.P.
contact info
Peter L Wheeler
Pierce Couch Hendrickson Baysinger & Green-Okc
contact info
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores East LP
Represented By
Michael W Brewer
Hiltgen & Brewer
contact info
Andre V Farinha
Hiltgen And Brewer
contact info
Plaintiff
Jake Vanspyker
Represented By
Greg S Keogh
Parrish Devaughn Injury Lawyers
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
17 17 misc Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan Wed 05/07 5:19 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Jake Vanspyker. (Keogh, Greg)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
16 16 misc Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan Mon 05/05 11:41 AM
JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Jake Vanspyker. (Keogh, Greg)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Entry of Appearance Mon 05/05 10:04 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Nathan D Rex on behalf of Jake Vanspyker Related [+]
Related: [-] x, Nathan
14 14 notice Entry of Appearance Mon 05/05 10:00 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Greg S Keogh on behalf of Jake Vanspyker (Keogh, Greg)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
13 13 1 pgs order Order Fri 05/02 5:24 PM
ORDER. Counsel for Plaintiff shall enter an appearance within seven (7) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Charles Goodwin on 05/02/2025. (jb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of Filing Notice of Removal Tue 03/25 1:30 PM
NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East LP(Brewer, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-Notice to State Court
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
11 11 misc Disclosure Statement - LLC Wed 03/19 2:34 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Mark Young Construction LLC . (Wheeler, Peter)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Wed 03/19 2:32 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Mark Young Construction LLC.(Wheeler, Peter)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer Fri 03/14 8:51 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Stores East LP.(Brewer, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
8 8 notice Entry of Appearance Thu 03/13 2:56 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Tiffany D Barker on behalf of Mark Young Construction LLC (Barker, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice ~Notice (other) Thu 03/13 2:48 PM
NOTICE (other) by Mark Young Construction LLC re1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Consent to Removal (Wheeler, Peter)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Entry of Appearance Thu 03/13 2:40 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Peter L Wheeler on behalf of Mark Young Construction LLC (Wheeler, Peter)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Entry of Appearance Thu 03/13 11:06 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Andre V Farinha on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East LP (Farinha, Andre)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Disclosure Statement - Corporate Thu 03/13 11:05 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Wal-Mart Stores East LP . (Brewer, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Jury Demand Thu 03/13 11:04 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Wal-Mart Stores East LP. (Brewer, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Entry of Appearance Thu 03/13 11:03 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Michael W Brewer on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East LP (Brewer, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 03/13 10:51 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Custer County District Court, case number CJ-2025-8 filed by Wal-Mart Stores East LP.(llr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - OSCN Case Details,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Petition,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Summons,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - EOA Greg Keogh,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - FS EOA and Reservation of Time for Def Mark Young,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Payment for a Civil Case Thu 03/13 11:01 AM
PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AOKWDC-4649153. (Brewer, Michael)
Related: [-]