Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:24-bk-11442

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Mary F Walrath
Case #: 1:25-ap-50399
Nature of Suit81 Bankruptcy - Subordination of claim or interest
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
William J. Rouhana, Jr.
Represented By
William J. Rouhana, Jr.
contact info
Defendant
Amy L. Newmark
Represented By
Amy L. Newmark
contact info
Defendant
Christopher Mitchell
Represented By
Christopher Mitchell
contact info
Defendant
Fred M. Cohen
Represented By
Fred M. Cohen
contact info
Defendant
Martin Pompadur
Represented By
Martin Pompadur
contact info
Defendant
Christina Weiss Lurie
Represented By
Christina Weiss Lurie
contact info
Defendant
Diana Wilkin
Represented By
Diana Wilkin
contact info
Defendant
Vikram Somaya
Represented By
Vikram Somaya
contact info
Defendant
Jason Meier
Represented By
Jason Meier
contact info
Defendant
Amanda R. Edwards
Represented By
Amanda R. Edwards
contact info
Defendant
Chicken Soup for the Soul Productions, LLC
Represented By
Chicken Soup for the Soul Productions, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Chicken Soup for the Soul, LLC
Represented By
Chicken Soup for the Soul, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Chicken Soup for the Soul Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Chicken Soup for the Soul Holdings, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Cosmo Denicola
Represented By
Cosmo Denicola
contact info
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, Chapter 7 Trustee
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd., Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103
Represented By
Alan J. Kornfeld
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Steven W Golden
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Richard M. Pachulski
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
28 28 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Tue 05/13 10:17 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Douglas P. Baumstein . Receipt Number 4684999, Filed by Christopher Mitchell. (McCartney, Brett)
Related: [-]
27 27 notice Appearance - Notice Tue 05/13 9:59 AM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Christopher Mitchell (McCartney, Brett)
Related: [-]
misc Add Attorney Tue 05/13 10:04 AM
Attorney Elizabeth Powers and Brett McCartney for Christopher Mitchell, Mutaz A. Ali and Brett McCartney for Christopher Mitchell added to case Filed by Christopher Mitchell. (McCartney, Brett)
Related: [-]
misc Add Attorney Tue 05/13 10:13 AM
Attorney Sarah Delia and Maliheh Zare for Jason Meier added to case Filed by Jason Meier. (Zare, Maliheh)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
26 26 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Mon 05/12 4:26 PM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 5/14/2025 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Related [+] (Carroll, John)
Related: [-] 637 ,22
25 25 notice Appearance - Notice Mon 05/12 3:47 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Jason Meier (Zare, Maliheh)
Related: [-]
24 24 2 pgs order Order Mon 05/12 12:12 PM
Order Approving Stipulated Scheduling Order Related [+] Signed on 5/12/2025. (LMC)
Related: [-] 21 ,23
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
23 23 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Mon 05/12 11:50 AM
Certification of Counsel Regarding order Approving Stipulated Scheduling Order Related [+] Filed by George L. Miller. (Golden, Steven)
Related: [-] 21
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order
22 22 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Mon 05/12 10:50 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 5/14/2025 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Carroll, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
21 21 motion Stipulation Fri 05/09 5:18 PM
Stipulation Stipulated Scheduling Order Between George L. Miller and all Defendants . Filed by George L. Miller. (Golden, Steven)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
20 20 notice Hearing - Notice Fri 05/02 11:14 AM
Notice of Hearing Regarding William Rouhana, Jr., Amy L. Newmark, Chicken Soup for the Soul Productions, LLC, Chicken Soup for the Soul, LLC and Chicken Soup for the Soul Holdings, LLC's Motion to Extend the Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Related [+] Filed by Chicken Soup for the Soul Holdings, LLC, Chicken Soup for the Soul Productions, LLC, Chicken Soup for the Soul, LLC, Amy L. Newmark, William J. Rouhana, Jr. Hearing scheduled for 5/14/2025 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Detweiler, Donald)
Related: [-] 6 ,12 ,17 ,18 ,19
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, April 28, 2025
19 19 notice Completion of Briefing - Notice Mon 04/28 10:11 PM
Notice of Completion of Briefing. Related [+] Filed by Chicken Soup for the Soul Holdings, LLC, Chicken Soup for the Soul Productions, LLC, Chicken Soup for the Soul, LLC, Amy L. Newmark, William J. Rouhana, Jr. (Detweiler, Donald)
Related: [-] 6 ,12 ,13 ,17 ,18
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
18 18 motion Request for Oral Argument Mon 04/28 10:01 PM
Request for Oral Argument Filed by Chicken Soup for the Soul Holdings, LLC, Chicken Soup for the Soul Productions, LLC, Chicken Soup for the Soul, LLC, Amy L. Newmark, William J. Rouhana, Jr. Related [+]. (Detweiler, Donald)
Related: [-] 6
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
17 17 answer Reply Wed 04/23 8:28 PM
Reply in Support of William Rouhana, Jr., Amy L. Newmark, Chicken Soup for the Soul Productions, LLC, Chicken Soup for the Soul, LLC and Chicken Soup for the Soul Holdings, LLC's Motion to Extend the Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Related [+] Filed by Chicken Soup for the Soul Holdings, LLC, Chicken Soup for the Soul Productions, LLC, Chicken Soup for the Soul, LLC, Amy L. Newmark, William J. Rouhana, Jr. (Detweiler, Donald)
Related: [-] 6 ,12 ,13
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
16 16 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Tue 04/22 4:58 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice for Thiru Vignarajah . Receipt Number 4378525, Filed by Vikram Somaya. (Thomas, Mary)
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs notice Appearance - Notice Tue 04/22 4:31 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Vikram Somaya (Thomas, Mary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
14 14 misc Certificate of Service Wed 04/16 3:38 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by George L. Miller. (Golden, Steven)
Related: [-] 12 ,13
13 13 3 pgs misc Declaration in Support Wed 04/16 3:36 PM
Declaration in Support Declaration of Patricia Jeffries in Support of Opposition to Motion to Extend the Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Filed by Defendants William J. Rouhana, Jr., Amy L. Newmark, Chicken Soup for the Soul Productions, LLC, Chicken Soup for the Soul, LLC, and Chicken Soup for the Soul Holdings, LLC Related [+] Filed by George L. Miller. (Golden, Steven)
Related: [-] 12
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
Att: 5 Exhibit 5
Att: 6 Exhibit 6
12 12 10 pgs answer Objection Wed 04/16 3:30 PM
Objection Opposition to Motion to Extend the Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Filed by Defendants William J. Rouhana, Jr., Amy L. Newmark, Chicken Soup for the Soul Productions, LLC, Chicken Soup for the Soul, LLC, and Chicken Soup for the Soul Holdings, LLC Related [+] Filed by George L. Miller (Golden, Steven)
Related: [-] 6
11 11 2 pgs order Appear pro hac vice Wed 04/16 3:21 PM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Steven J. Levitt Related [+] Signed on 4/16/2025. (LMC)
Related: [-] 9
10 10 order Appear pro hac vice Wed 04/16 3:20 PM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Jessica B. Magee Related [+] Signed on 4/16/2025. (LMC)
Related: [-] 8
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
9 9 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Tue 04/15 5:46 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Steven J. Levitt, Esquire of Holland & Knight LLP . Receipt Number ADEDC-4662, Filed by Cosmo Denicola. (Miller, Evan)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Tue 04/15 5:41 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Jessica B. Magee, Esquire of Holland & Knight LLP . Receipt Number ADEDC-4662, Filed by Cosmo Denicola. (Miller, Evan)
Related: [-]
7 7 3 pgs notice Appearance - Notice Tue 04/15 5:37 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Cosmo Denicola (Miller, Evan)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
6 6 motion Extend - Motion Fri 04/11 1:42 PM
Motion to Extend Time // William Rouhana, Jr., Amy L. Newmark, Chicken Soup for the Soul Productions, LLC, Chicken Soup for the Soul, LLC and Chicken Soup for the Soul Holdings, LLC's Motion to Extend the Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Filed by Chicken Soup for the Soul Holdings, LLC, Chicken Soup for the Soul Productions, LLC, Chicken Soup for the Soul, LLC, Amy L. Newmark, William J. Rouhana, Jr. Related [+]. (Detweiler, Donald)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
5 5 motion Stipulation Tue 04/08 8:44 PM
Stipulation Between Fred M. Cohen, Christina Weiss Lurie, Martin Pompadur, Diana Wilkin and Chapter 7 Trustee, Cosmo DeNicola, and Vikram Somaya Extending the Time to Respond to Complaint and Establishing a Briefing Schedule . Filed by Fred M. Cohen, Christina Weiss Lurie, Martin Pompadur, Diana Wilkin Related [+].
Related: [-] 1 mington, Tori
Thursday, April 03, 2025
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Thu 04/03 3:12 PM
Supplemental Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by George L. Miller. (O'Neill, James)
Related: [-] 1 ,3
Thursday, March 13, 2025
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Thu 03/13 5:08 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendants Chicken Soup for the Soul Holdings, LLC, Chicken Soup for the Soul Productions, LLC, Chicken Soup for the Soul, LLC, Fred M. Cohen, Cosmo Denicola, Amanda R. Edwards, Christina Weiss Lurie, Jason Meier, Christopher Mitchell, Amy L. Newmark, Martin Pompadur, William J. Rouhana, Jr., Vikram Somaya, Diana Wilkin. Related [+] (Golden, Steven)
Related: [-] ument1
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 03/12 6:27 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 25-50399 MFW] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A12074096, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 03/12 6:26 PM
Adversary case 25-50399 Complaint for (I) Breach of Fiduciary Duty; (II) Aiding and Abetting Breach of Fiduciary Duty; (III) Avoidance of Fraudulent Transfers; (IV) Recovery of Illegal Dividends; (V) Damages for Non-Payment of Employee Wages, Benefits and Payroll Taxes; (VI) Equitable Subordination; and (VII) Disallowance of Claims by George L. Miller against William J. Rouhana, Jr., Amy L. Newmark, Christopher Mitchell, Fred M. Cohen, Denicola Cosmo, Martin Pompadur, Christina Weiss Lurie, Diana Wilkin, Vikram Somaya, Jason Meier, Amanda R. Edwards, Chicken Soup for the Soul Productions, LLC, Chicken Soup for the Soul, LLC, Chicken Soup for the Soul Holdings, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(81 (Subordination of claim or interest)). AP Summons Served due date: 6/10/2025. (Golden, Steven)
Related: [-]