California Southern District Court
Judge:Michael M Anello
Referred: Lupe Rodriguez, Jr
Case #: 3:25-cv-00590
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1332lr Diversity - Labor
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2025
Case in other court:Superior Court of California, County of Imperial, ECU003940
Last checked: Saturday Apr 26, 2025 4:32 AM PDT
Defendant
Does 1 through 100
Defendant
Dune Company of Imperial Valley, LLC
Represented By
Dessislava P Nintcheva
Pierson Ferdinand LLP
contact info
Defendant
Earthwork Seeds, LLC
Represented By
Dessislava P Nintcheva
Pierson Ferdinand LLP
contact info
Defendant
Gowan Cotton Company, LLC
Represented By
Dessislava P Nintcheva
Pierson Ferdinand LLP
contact info
Defendant
Gowan Seed Company, LLC
Represented By
Dessislava P Nintcheva
Pierson Ferdinand LLP
contact info
Defendant
Gowan SeedTech LLC
Represented By
Dessislava P Nintcheva
Pierson Ferdinand LLP
contact info
Defendant
Gowan USA, LLC
Represented By
Dessislava P Nintcheva
Pierson Ferdinand LLP
contact info
Defendant
The Dune Company of Salinas,LLC
Represented By
Dessislava P Nintcheva
Pierson Ferdinand LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Adrian Garcia
Represented By
David Daniel Bibiyan
Bibiyan Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Jason W. Rothman
Bibiyan Law Group, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, April 10, 2025
12 12 motion Remand Thu 04/10 6:14 PM
MOTION to Remand by Adrian Garcia. (Rothman, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
11 11 7 pgs order Order for Early Neutral Evaluation Mon 04/07 2:25 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference: Early Neutral Evaluation set for 5/21/2025 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr.. Case Management Conference set for 5/21/2025 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr.. Joint Discovery Plan due 5/14/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr on 4/7/25.(aas)
Related: [-]
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Mon 04/07 8:00 AM
ORDER Denying8 Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to File Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 4/7/25. (aas)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
9 9 order Order of Judge Transfer Fri 04/04 1:47 PM
MINUTE ORDER OF TRANSFER. Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr. for all further proceedings. The new case number is 25cv590 MMA(LR).(no document attached) (rmc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/03 1:53 PM
NOTICE JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND PLAINTIFFS DEADLINE TO FILE REMAND MOTION BASED ON EARLY NEUTRAL EVAULATION by Adrian Garcia(Rothman, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 04/02 9:48 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Dune Company of Imperial Valley, LLC, Earthwork Seeds, LLC, Gowan Cotton Company, LLC, Gowan Seed Company, LLC, Gowan SeedTech LLC, Gowan USA, LLC, The Dune Company of Salinas,LLC.(Nintcheva, Dessislava)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Thursday, March 20, 2025
6 6 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Thu 03/20 1:11 PM
ORDER Denying4 Joint Motion to Stay ; and Granting5 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 3/20/25. (aas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Wed 03/19 1:13 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Responsive Pleadings by Dune Company of Imperial Valley, LLC. (Nintcheva, Dessislava)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
4 4 motion Stay Tue 03/18 11:01 AM
Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings to Attend Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and/or Private Mediation by Dune Company of Imperial Valley, LLC. (Nintcheva, Dessislava)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 03/13 6:49 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dune Company of Imperial Valley, LLC, Earthwork Seeds, LLC, Gowan Cotton Company, LLC, Gowan Seed Company, LLC, Gowan SeedTech LLC, Gowan USA, LLC, The Dune Company of Salinas,LLC. (Nintcheva, Dessislava) (aas)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Party With Financial Interest Thu 03/13 6:43 PM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Dune Company of Imperial Valley, LLC, Earthwork Seeds, LLC, Gowan Cotton Company, LLC, Gowan Seed Company, LLC, Gowan SeedTech LLC, Gowan USA, LLC, The Dune Company of Salinas,LLC (Nintcheva, Dessislava) (aas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 03/13 9:42 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-19691130.), filed by The Dune Company of Salinas,LLC, Gowan Cotton Company, LLC, Earthwork Seeds, LLC, Gowan Seed Company, LLC, Dune Company of Imperial Valley, LLC, Gowan SeedTech LLC, Gowan USA, LLC. The new case number is 3:25-cv-590-MMA-MSB. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg are assigned to the case.(axc1) (anh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Declaration Mauricio Manjarrez,
Att: 3 Declaration Dessi N. Day,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit1 to Dessi N. Day Declaration,
Att: 5 Proof of Service