California Central District Court
Judge:George H Wu
Referred: Alicia G Rosenberg
Case #: 2:25-cv-02229
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Personal Injury
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2025
Case in other court:Los Angeles County Superior Court, 24TRCV04342
Last checked: Sunday Apr 27, 2025 2:40 AM PDT
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Lowes Home Centers, LLC
Represented By
Andrea Breuer
Tharpe And Howell LLP
contact info
Stephanie Forman
Tharpe And Howell LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Carrie Johnson
Represented By
Casey Anne Hultin
Jacoby And Meyers Attorneys LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jennifer Tapia
Represented By
Casey Anne Hultin
Jacoby And Meyers Attorneys LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 21, 2025
13 13 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Mon 04/21 1:06 PM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge George H Wu. As per C.D. Cal. L.R. 7-15, the April 24, 2025 scheduling conference date is taken off calendar. The Court sets the following dates: A post-mediation status conference is set for October 16, 2025 at 8:30 a.m., with mediation to be completed by October 12. The pre-trial conference will be held on January 8, 2026 at 8:30 a.m. Jury trial will begin on January 20, 2026 at 9:00 a.m. (See document for additional deadlines and details). (aco)
Related: [-]
12 12 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Mon 04/21 10:59 AM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Senior District Judge George H. Wu: Counsel may appear telephonically at the SCHEDULING CONFERENCE set for Thursday, April 24, 2025 at 8:30 a.m. by contacting the court clerk at javier_gonzalez@cacd.uscourts.gov for dial-in information. The Court recommends counsel use a landline without the use of the speakerphone when appearing by telephone due to sound reception. If a cellular phone is used and it causes interference or interruptions, the Court will stop the proceeding and require counsel to appear in person. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
11 11 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Wed 04/16 3:16 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 to 7 days, filed by Defendant Lowes Home Centers, LLC.. (Breuer, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
10 10 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Tue 03/18 3:48 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Lowes Home Centers, LLC, served on March 18, 2025. (Breuer, Andrea)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Tue 03/18 11:04 AM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H Wu. The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for April 24, 2025 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court no later than April 17, 2025. See Local Rule 26-1. (aco)
Related: [-]
8 8 10 pgs order Order Tue 03/18 11:03 AM
STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth "Local Rules") 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (See document for further details). (aco)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 03/14 3:49 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 03/14 3:49 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 03/14 3:48 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (lh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 03/13 11:44 AM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant LOWE'S Home Centers, LLC, identifying Lowes Companies, Inc.. (Breuer, Andrea)
Related: [-]
3 3 trial Jury Demand Thu 03/13 11:42 AM
DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant LOWE'S Home Centers, LLC.. (Breuer, Andrea)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 03/13 11:41 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant LOWE'S Home Centers, LLC. (Breuer, Andrea)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 03/13 11:40 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 24TRCV04342 Receipt No: ACACDC-39292034 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant LOWE'S Home Centers, LLC. (Attorney Andrea Breuer added to party LOWE'S Home Centers, LLC(pty:dft))(Breuer, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Fri 03/14 4:13 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Lowes Home Centers, LLC, filed by Plaintiff Jennifer Tapia, Carrie Johnson. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 12/19/2024 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ) (lh)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Fri 03/14 4:15 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant Lowes Home Centers, LLC. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 3/4/2025 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 )(lh)
Related: [-]