New York Southern District Court
Judge:Colleen Mcmahon
Case #: 1:25-cv-02105
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause15:294 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 27, 2025 5:40 AM EDT
Defendant
Regent Bank
Represented By
Andrea Christine Sisca
Ivey, Barnum & O'Mara, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Hudson Insurance Company
100 William Street
New York, NY 10038
Represented By
Linda Mandel Gates
Platzer, Swergold, Karlin, Levine, Goldberg & Jaslow
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/09 7:37 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Herman Koblenz on behalf of Hudson Insurance Company..(Koblenz, Adam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
20 20 order Case Management Plan Tue 05/06 4:18 PM
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: This case is not to be tried to a jury. Amended Pleadings due by 6/15/2025. Joinder of Parties due by 6/15/2025. Expert Discovery due by 9/24/2025. Discovery due by 9/24/2025. Pretrial Order due by 11/7/2025. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 5/6/25) (yv)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
19 19 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Mon 05/05 2:53 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . MOTION to Change Venue . . Document filed by Regent Bank..(Sisca, Andrea)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Proposed Case Management Plan Mon 05/05 2:50 PM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Hudson Insurance Company..(Gates, Linda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
17 17 19 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Wed 04/30 1:18 AM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . MOTION to Change Venue . . Document filed by Hudson Insurance Company..(Gates, Linda)
Related: [-]
16 16 respm Affirmation in Opposition to Motion Wed 04/30 1:17 AM
AFFIRMATION of Linda Mandel Gates in Opposition re:12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . MOTION to Change Venue .. Document filed by Hudson Insurance Company..(Gates, Linda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
15 15 order Memo Endorsement Thu 04/24 4:01 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:14 Letter filed by Hudson Insurance Company. ENDORSEMENT: Noted, thank you. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 4/24/2025) (ar)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
14 14 misc Letter Tue 04/22 3:31 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Linda Mandel Gates dated April 22, 2025 re: Individual Part Rules IV-A. Document filed by Hudson Insurance Company..(Gates, Linda)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
13 13 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 04/21 5:46 PM
AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Regent Capital Corporation, Other Affiliate Regent Executive Center I, LLC, Other Affiliate Regent Insurance, LLC for Regent Bank. Document filed by Regent Bank..(Sisca, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 04/17 11:38 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Andrea Christine Sisca to RE-FILE Document No. 11 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the jurisdiction of this action is based on diversity - the party/intervenor did not name and identify the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes or No radio button - If Yes - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time - name and identify the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. Please use the revised form found here NYSD form page (kw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
12 12 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Change Venue Wed 04/16 2:35 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction .( Responses due by 4/30/2025), MOTION to Change Venue . Document filed by Regent Bank..(Sisca, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss or, in the alternative, to Change Venue,
Att: 2 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Motion to Dismiss or, in the alternative, to Change Venue
11 11 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 04/16 2:24 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Regent Capital Corporation, Other Affiliate Regent Executive Center I, LLC, Other Affiliate Regent Insurance, LLC for Regent Bank. Document filed by Regent Bank..(Sisca, Andrea)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/16 2:20 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrea Christine Sisca on behalf of Regent Bank..(Sisca, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
9 9 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Tue 04/15 5:28 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Regent Bank served on 3/27/2025, answer due 4/17/2025. Service was accepted by Autumn Lyons, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Hudson Insurance Company..(Gates, Linda)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Tue 04/15 2:47 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Regent Bank served on 3/27/2025, answer due 5/27/2025. Service was accepted by Autumn Lyons, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Hudson Insurance Company..(Gates, Linda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
7 7 service Summons Issued Tue 03/25 4:21 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Regent Bank. (sj)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 03/24 3:16 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to REGENT BANK, re:4 Complaint,. Document filed by Hudson Insurance Company..(Gates, Linda)
Related: [-]
5 5 6 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Mon 03/24 2:57 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby, ORDERED as follows: Counsel receiving this order shall contact all counsel of record ( or where a party is not yet represented, such party) and, if necessary, provide them with a copy of this order. If a conforming case management plan is submitted at least two business days prior to the scheduled initial conference and subsequently approved by the Court, the initial conference will be canceled automatically. If a motion has been filed either before or after the case management plan is approved, and the parties desire a conference, a letter must be submitted to the Court via ECF specifically asking that the initial conference not be canceled. If the parties fail to agree upon such a plan or fail to submit the plan to the Court within the time provided (at least two business days before the conference date), the parties must appear at a conference on 5/8/2025 at 10:00 a.m., in courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, 10007. (Initial Conference set for 5/8/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon.) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/24/25) (yv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
4 4 cmp Complaint Wed 03/19 4:46 PM
COMPLAINT against Regent Bank. Document filed by Hudson Insurance Company..(Gates, Linda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A - Payment Bond,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. B - Regent Bank Irrevocable Letter of Credit - redacted,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. C - Partial Draw Letter 1-2-25,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. D - Emails between Plaintiff and Defendant,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. E - 2-10-25 Draw Letter - Redacted,
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex. F - 3-3-25 Demand Letter - Redacted
Monday, March 17, 2025
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 03/17 4:38 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Gates, Linda)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Fri 03/14 12:08 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Linda Mandel Gates to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not signed by the ECF filing attorney of record. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Fri 03/14 12:10 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Linda Mandel Gates to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated December 4, 2024; the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet; the PDF must be filed separately. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated December 4, 2024. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated December 4, 2024 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-cover-sheet-2.. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Fri 03/14 12:12 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Linda Mandel Gates. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 190 (Contract: Other); Citizenship Plaintiff code 2 (Citizen of Another State); Citizenship Defendant code 2 (Citizen of Another State); Dollar Demand $300,000,000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 140 (Negotiable Instrument); the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 4 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-This State); the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the Dollar Demand has been modified to $300,000;. (jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 03/14 12:13 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 03/14 12:14 PM
Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 03/14 12:14 PM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
2 2 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 03/13 5:45 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Fairfax Financial Holdings, LTD., Corporate Parent Odyssey Reinsurance Company, Corporate Parent Odyssey Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Odyssey US Holdings, Inc. for Hudson Insurance Company. Document filed by Hudson Insurance Company..(Gates, Linda)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 03/13 5:34 PM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT against Regent Bank. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30763612)Document filed by Hudson Insurance Company..(Gates, Linda) Modified on 3/14/2025 (jgo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A - Payment Bond,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. B - Regent Bank Irrevocable Letter of Credit - redacted,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. D - Partial Draw Letter 1-2-25 - Redacted,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. E - Emails between Plaintiff and Defendant - Redacted,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. E - 2-10-25 Draw Letter - Redacted,
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex. F - 3-3-25 Demand Letter - Redacted,
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet