Maine District Court
Judge:Nancy Torresen
Referred: John C Nivison
Case #: 2:25-cv-00088
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause28:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2025
Terminated:Apr 04, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, April 04, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 04/04 3:21 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by AARON ALDRICH(slg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter,
Att: 2 Envelope
Monday, March 17, 2025
5 5 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs Mon 03/17 2:23 PM
ORDER denying3 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 03/17 2:25 PM
Set Deadlines: Filing Fee or completed Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs due by 3/31/2025. (MFS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Pro Se Fri 03/14 9:57 AM
NOTICE of Pro Se Appearance form filed by AARON ALDRICH (jlm)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs Fri 03/14 9:56 AM
MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs by AARON ALDRICH (jlm)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 03/14 9:56 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (jlm)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/14 9:54 AM
COMPLAINT against ANDROSCOGGIN COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, ERIC SAMSON with Jury Demand, filed by AARON ALDRICH. (Service of Process Deadline 6/11/2025)(jlm) (jlm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Claim,
Att: 2 Waiver of Service - Aldrich,
Att: 3 Notice of Lawsuit
Att: 4 (3/14/2025) Envelope