Missouri Eastern District Court
Judge:Henry Edward Autrey
Case #: 4:25-cv-00324
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 3:58 AM CDT
Consolidated Filer Plaintiff
Rachelle Kiesling
Represented By
Michael Dell'Angelo
Berger Montague Pc - Philadelpha
contact info
Jonathan Korte
Rosca Scarlato LLC
contact info
Alan L. Rosca
Rosca Scarlato LLC
contact info
Matthew L. Dameron
Williams Dirks LLC
contact info
Andrew Scott Williams
Simmons Hanly Llc - Alton
contact info
Sona Shah
Simmons Hanly Llc - New York
contact info
Thien An Vinh Truong
Simmons Hanly Llc - New York
contact info
Michael J. Angelides
Simmons Hanly Llc - Alton
contact info
Alex B. Heller
Berger Montague Pc - Philadelpha
contact info
Thomas I. Sheridan, III
Simmons Hanly Llc - New York
contact info
Michael Blatchley
Bernstein Litowitz Llp - New York
contact info
Consolidated Filer Plaintiff
Laura Williams
Represented By
Michael Dell'Angelo
Berger Montague Pc - Philadelpha
contact info
Jonathan Korte
Rosca Scarlato LLC
contact info
Alan L. Rosca
Rosca Scarlato LLC
contact info
Matthew L. Dameron
Williams Dirks LLC
contact info
Andrew Scott Williams
Simmons Hanly Llc - Alton
contact info
Sona Shah
Simmons Hanly Llc - New York
contact info
Thien An Vinh Truong
Simmons Hanly Llc - New York
contact info
Michael J. Angelides
Simmons Hanly Llc - Alton
contact info
Alex B. Heller
Berger Montague Pc - Philadelpha
contact info
Thomas I. Sheridan, III
Simmons Hanly Llc - New York
contact info
Michael Blatchley
Bernstein Litowitz Llp - New York
contact info
Defendant
Stifel Bank & Trust
Represented By
Tyler J. Andrews
Sullivan And Cromwell Llp - Los Angeles
contact info
Robert A. Sacks
Sullivan And Cromwell Llp - Los Angeles
contact info
Winthrop B. Reed, III
Lewis Rice Llc - St. Louis
contact info
Diane McGimsey
Sullivan And Cromwell Llp - Los Angeles
contact info
Defendant
Stifel Financial Corp.
Represented By
Tyler J. Andrews
Sullivan And Cromwell Llp - Los Angeles
contact info
Robert A. Sacks
Sullivan And Cromwell Llp - Los Angeles
contact info
Winthrop B. Reed, III
Lewis Rice Llc - St. Louis
contact info
Diane McGimsey
Sullivan And Cromwell Llp - Los Angeles
contact info
Defendant
Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc.
501 North Broadway
St. Louis, MO 63102
Represented By
Tyler J. Andrews
Sullivan And Cromwell Llp - Los Angeles
contact info
Robert A. Sacks
Sullivan And Cromwell Llp - Los Angeles
contact info
Winthrop B. Reed, III
Lewis Rice Llc - St. Louis
contact info
Diane McGimsey
Sullivan And Cromwell Llp - Los Angeles
contact info
Plaintiff
Briarwood Investments, Inc.
Represented By
Alex Kaplan
Robbins Geller Llp - Boca Raton
contact info
Andrew Rees
Robbins Geller Llp - Boca Raton
contact info
Scott Dion
Robbins Geller Llp - Boca Raton
contact info
Rene Alan Gonzalez
Robbins Geller Llp - Boca Raton
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
45 45 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/07 12:39 PM
NOTICE RELATED ACTION: by Plaintiff Briarwood Investments, Inc. (Astley, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
44 44 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 05/02 6:19 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re40 MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel (Interim) and Memorandum of Law names:Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP filed by Plaintiff Briarwood Investments, Inc.. (Astley, Stephen)
Related: [-]
43 43 14 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 05/02 5:35 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re38 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g) filed by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Rachelle Kiesling, Laura Williams.(Williams, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of A. Williams, S. Shah, M. Dell'Angelo & M. Blatchley in Further Support of Motion for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel,
Att: 2 Exhibit AA-4/25/2025 Ameriprise Hearing Transcript,
Att: 3 Exhibit BB-3/25/2025 Charles Schwab Order,
Att: 4 Exhibit CC-2/28/2025 Wells Fargo Hearing Transcript
Friday, April 25, 2025
42 42 14 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Fri 04/25 8:08 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re38 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g) - Plaintiff Briarwood Investments, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Kiesling and Williams' Motion for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel - filed by Plaintiff Briarwood Investments, Inc..(Astley, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Stephen R. Astley in Support
41 41 20 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Fri 04/25 5:07 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re40 MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel (Interim) and Memorandum of Law names:Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP filed by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Rachelle Kiesling, Laura Williams.(Williams, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Supplemental Joint Declaration of A. Williams, S. Shah, M. Dell'Angelo & M. Blatchley,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. U - Mehlman Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. V - Chesapeake Hearing Transcript,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. W - Declaration of Christin J. Hill,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. X - SEC Litigation Release,
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex. Y - SEC v. Fireman Final Judgment,
Att: 7 Exhibit Ex. Z - Chesapeake Class Cert. Opposition
Friday, April 18, 2025
40 40 motion Appoint Lead Counsel Fri 04/18 10:15 PM
MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel (Interim) and Memorandum of Law names:Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP by Plaintiff Briarwood Investments, Inc..(Astley, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Stephen R. Astley in Support of Motion to Appoint Interim Lead Counsel
39 39 20 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 04/18 9:43 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re38 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g) filed by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Rachelle Kiesling, Laura Williams.(Williams, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Joint Attorney Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F,
Att: 8 Exhibit G,
Att: 9 Exhibit H,
Att: 10 Exhibit I,
Att: 11 Exhibit J,
Att: 12 Exhibit K,
Att: 13 Exhibit L,
Att: 14 Exhibit M,
Att: 15 Exhibit N,
Att: 16 Exhibit O,
Att: 17 Exhibit P,
Att: 18 Exhibit Q,
Att: 19 Exhibit R,
Att: 20 Exhibit S,
Att: 21 Exhibit T
38 38 motion Appoint Counsel Fri 04/18 9:30 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g) by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Rachelle Kiesling, Laura Williams. (Williams, Andrew)
Related: [-]
37 37 order A Docket Text Order Fri 04/18 12:08 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:36 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael D. Blatchley. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-11205962) by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Rachelle Kiesling, Laura Williams.(Blatchley, Michael) GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 4/18/2025. (CLH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
36 36 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/17 8:57 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael D. Blatchley. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-11205962) by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Rachelle Kiesling, Laura Williams.(Blatchley, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
35 35 order A Docket Text Order Thu 04/17 7:43 AM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:34 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael Dell'Angelo. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-11201566) by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Rachelle Kiesling, Laura Williams.(Dell'Angelo, Michael) GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 4/17/2025. (CLH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
34 34 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/15 11:09 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael Dell'Angelo. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-11201566) by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Rachelle Kiesling, Laura Williams.(Dell'Angelo, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing
33 33 order A Docket Text Order Tue 04/15 10:50 AM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:29 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Alex B. Heller filed by Rachelle Kiesling, Laura Williams; GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 4/15/2025. (HMA)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
32 32 order A Docket Text Order Mon 04/14 3:50 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tyler J. Andrews; GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 4/14/2025. (JEB)
Related: [-]
31 31 order A Docket Text Order Mon 04/14 3:49 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Diane L. McGimsey; GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 4/14/2025. (JEB)
Related: [-]
30 30 order A Docket Text Order Mon 04/14 3:48 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Robert A. Sacks; GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 4/14/2025. (JEB)
Related: [-]
29 29 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/14 3:15 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Alex B. Heller. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-11200148) by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Rachelle Kiesling, Laura Williams.(Heller, Alex)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing
Friday, April 11, 2025
28 28 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/11 6:59 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tyler J. Andrews. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-11197969) by Defendants Stifel Bank & Trust, Stifel Financial Corp., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc..(Andrews, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing for Tyler J. Andrews
27 27 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/11 6:54 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Diane L. McGimsey. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-11197967) by Defendants Stifel Bank & Trust, Stifel Financial Corp., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc..(McGimsey, Diane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing for Diane L. McGimsey
26 26 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/11 6:47 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Robert A. Sacks. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-11197959) by Defendants Stifel Bank & Trust, Stifel Financial Corp., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc..(Sacks, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing for Robert A. Sacks
25 25 2 pgs order Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule) ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Fri 04/11 11:13 AM
ORDER. This matter is before the Court on the parties' Amended Motion to Consolidate, [Doc. No.24 ]. The motion is granted. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that these Actions shall be consolidated into the action bearing the lower case number, Briarwood Investment, Inc. v. Stifel Financial Corp. et al., No. 25-CV-00324-HEA (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 4/11/2025. (HMA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
24 24 motion Consolidate Cases Thu 04/10 3:44 PM
Amended MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Establish Schedule for Appt of Interim Class Counsel Consolidate with higher case number 25-CV-00338-SPM by Defendants Stifel Bank & Trust, Stifel Financial Corp., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc.. Related [+]
Related: [-] ed, Winthrop
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
23 23 misc Stipulation Tue 04/08 3:51 PM
STIPULATION To Consolidate and Establish Schedule For Appointment of Interim Class Counsel by Plaintiff Briarwood Investments, Inc.. (Angelides, Michael)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Tue 04/08 2:20 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Stifel Financial Corp... Related [+]
Related: [-] ed, Winthrop
21 21 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Tue 04/08 2:19 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Stifel Financial Corp.. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. Related [+]
Related: [-] ed, Winthrop
20 20 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Tue 04/08 2:18 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Stifel Bank & Trust, Stifel Financial Corp... Related [+]
Related: [-] ed, Winthrop
19 19 misc Entry of Appearance Tue 04/08 2:16 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Winthrop B. Reed, III for Defendants Stifel Bank & Trust, Stifel Financial Corp., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc.. Related [+]
Related: [-] ed, Winthrop
Thursday, April 03, 2025
18 18 order A Docket Text Order Thu 04/03 1:46 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Alex Kaplan. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-11172902) by Plaintiff Briarwood Investments, Inc..(Kaplan, Alex) filed by Briarwood Investments, Inc. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 4/3/2025. (CLH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
17 17 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/01 10:22 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Alex Kaplan. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-11172902) by Plaintiff Briarwood Investments, Inc..(Kaplan, Alex)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing Florida Supreme Court
Thursday, March 27, 2025
16 16 order A Docket Text Order Thu 03/27 8:18 AM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Scott Isaac Dion. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-11159750) by Plaintiff Briarwood Investments, Inc.. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 3/27/2025. (CLH)
Related: [-]
15 15 order A Docket Text Order Thu 03/27 8:15 AM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Rene Alan Gonzalez. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-11159686) by Plaintiff Briarwood Investments, Inc.. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 3/27/2025. (CLH)
Related: [-]
14 14 order A Docket Text Order Thu 03/27 8:14 AM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Andrew Thomas Rees. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-11159518) by Plaintiff Briarwood Investments, Inc.. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 3/27/2025. (CLH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 03/26 1:19 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Briarwood Investments, Inc.. Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc. served on 3/18/2025, answer due 4/8/2025. (Astley, Stephen)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 03/26 1:18 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Briarwood Investments, Inc.. Stifel Financial Corp. served on 3/18/2025, answer due 4/8/2025. (Astley, Stephen)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 03/26 1:17 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Briarwood Investments, Inc.. Stifel Bank & Trust served on 3/18/2025, answer due 4/8/2025. (Astley, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
10 10 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/25 10:29 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Scott Isaac Dion. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-11159750) by Plaintiff Briarwood Investments, Inc..(Dion, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing Florida Supreme Court
9 9 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/25 10:20 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Rene Alan Gonzalez. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-11159686) by Plaintiff Briarwood Investments, Inc..(Gonzalez, Rene)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing Florida Supreme Court
8 8 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/25 10:00 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Andrew Thomas Rees. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-11159518) by Plaintiff Briarwood Investments, Inc.. Related [+]
Related: [-] es, Andrew
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
7 7 order CJRA Order Tue 03/18 4:17 PM
CJRA ORDER (NMG). Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Henry Edward Autrey for all further proceedings (CLH)
Related: [-]
misc Letter Magistrate Consent Non-Compliance Tue 03/18 1:19 PM
Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Briarwood Investments, Inc. to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click[LINK:here] for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 3/25/2025. (ANR)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
6 6 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/17 11:30 AM
Docket Text Order: The Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice5 filed by Attorney Stephen R. Astley is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 3/17/2025. (KXS)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
5 5 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/14 3:36 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Stephen R. Astley. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-11142802) by Plaintiff Briarwood Investments, Inc..(Astley, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
4 4 notice Electronic Notice - Attorney not Admitted to MOED Fri 03/14 12:50 PM
Electronic Notice - Application for Admission needed as to Stephen R. Astley. Review of case shows that Attorney Stephen R. Astley is not currently a member of our Bar. For instructions on applying for bar admission or moving for pro hac vice admission, please follow the instructions located on our website at[LINK:https://www.moed.uscourts.gov] under the Attorney tab. Notice only, no.pdf attached. (JBH)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Notice of Process Server Fri 03/14 11:10 AM
NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Briarwood Investments, Inc. Process Server: Class Action Research c/o Janis Dingman (Astley, Stephen)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Fri 03/14 11:08 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Briarwood Investments, Inc.. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Astley, Stephen)
Related: [-]
1 1 36 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 03/14 11:05 AM
COMPLAINT against defendant Stifel Bank & Trust, Stifel Financial Corp., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc. with receipt number AMOEDC-11141518, in the amount of $405 Jury Demand,, filed by Briarwood Investments, Inc..(Astley, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons STIFEL BANK & TRUST,
Att: 3 Summons STIFEL FINANCIAL CORP,
Att: 4 Summons STIFEL, NICOLAUS & COMPANY, INC,
Att: 5 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form
misc Case Opening Notification Fri 03/14 12:51 PM
Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Shirley P. Mensah. 3 Summons(es) issued and emailed to Stephen R. Astley. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click[LINK:here] for the instructions. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible.[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (JBH)
Related: [-]